S.B. No. 1753 AN ACT relating to the identification requirements of certain health care providers associated with a hospital. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Section 241.009, Health and Safety Code, is amended by adding Subsections (c) and (d) to read as follows: (c) For purposes of Subsection (b)(3), the identification badge of a health care provider licensed under Title 3, Occupations Code, must clearly state: (1) "physician," if the provider holds a license under Subtitle B of that title; (2) "chiropractor," "podiatrist," "midwife," "physician assistant," "acupuncturist," or "surgical assistant," as applicable, if the provider holds a license under Subtitle C of that title; (3) "dentist" or "dental hygienist," as applicable, if the provider holds a license under Subtitle D of that title; (4) "licensed vocational nurse," "registered nurse," "nurse practitioner," "nurse midwife," "nurse anesthetist," or "clinical nurse specialist," as applicable, if the provider holds a license under Subtitle E of that title; (5) "optometrist," or "therapeutic optometrist," as applicable, if the provider holds a license under Subtitle F of that title; (6) "speech-language pathologist" or "audiologist," as applicable, if the provider holds a license under Subtitle G of that title; (7) "physical therapist," "occupational therapist," or "massage therapist," as applicable, if the provider holds a license under Subtitle H of that title; (8) "medical radiologic technologist," "medical physicist," "perfusionist," "respiratory care practitioner," "orthotist," or "prosthetist," as applicable, if the provider holds a license or certificate, as appropriate, under Subtitle K of that title; and (9) "dietitian," if the provider holds a license under Subtitle M of that title. (d) Notwithstanding Subsection (b)(3), a hospital licensed under this chapter is not required to list the type of license held by a provider on a health care provider's photo identification badge until September 1, 2019. This subsection expires September 1, 2020. SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2015. ______________________________ ______________________________ President of the Senate Speaker of the House I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1753 passed the Senate on April 15, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. ______________________________ Secretary of the Senate I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1753 passed the House on May 8, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 115, Nays 21, two present not voting. ______________________________ Chief Clerk of the House Approved: ______________________________ Date ______________________________ Governor