Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1756 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 06/01/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 1756


 AN ACT
 relating to the issuance of driver's licenses and personal
 identification certificates and the classification and operation
 of certain vehicles; authorizing a fee.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 521.001, Transportation Code, is amended
 by amending Subsection (a)(6-a) and adding Subsection (c) to read
 as follows:
 (6-a)  "Motorcycle" includes an enclosed three-wheeled
 passenger vehicle that:
 (A)  is designed to operate with three wheels in
 contact with the ground;
 (B)  [has a minimum unladen weight of 900 lbs.;
 [(C)]  has a single, completely enclosed,
 occupant compartment; and
 (C) [(D)]  at a minimum, is equipped with:
 (i)  seats that are certified by the vehicle
 manufacturer to meet the requirements of Federal Motor Vehicle
 Safety Standard No. 207, 49 C.F.R. Section 571.207;
 (ii)  a steering wheel used to maneuver the
 vehicle;
 (iii)  a propulsion unit located in front of
 or behind the enclosed occupant compartment;
 (iv)  a seat belt for each vehicle occupant
 certified by the manufacturer to meet the requirements of Federal
 Motor Vehicle Safety Standard No. 209, 49 C.F.R. Section 571.209;
 (v)  a windshield and one or more windshield
 wipers certified by the manufacturer to meet the requirements of
 Federal Motor Vehicle Safety Standard No. 205, 49 C.F.R. Section
 571.205, and Federal Motor Vehicle Safety Standard No. 104, 49
 C.F.R. Section 571.104; [and]
 (vi)  a vehicle structure certified by the
 vehicle manufacturer to meet the requirements of Federal Motor
 Vehicle Safety Standard No. 216, 49 C.F.R. Section 571.216, if:
 (a)  the unladen weight of the vehicle
 is more than 900 pounds; or
 (b)  the unladen weight of the vehicle
 is not more than 900 pounds and the vehicle has a maximum speed
 capability of more than 40 miles per hour; and
 (vii)  an active tilt control system if the
 unladen weight of the vehicle is not more than 900 pounds and the
 vehicle has a maximum speed capability of 40 miles per hour or
 less[; and
 [(E)     is produced by its manufacturer in a minimum
 quantity of 300 in any calendar year].
 (c)  The department by rule may define types of vehicles that
 are "motorcycles" for the purposes of this chapter, in addition to
 those defined under Subsection (a)(6-a).  The Texas Department of
 Motor Vehicles by rule may define the types of vehicles that are
 "motorcycles" for the purposes of Chapters 501, 502, and 503.  This
 subsection applies only to vehicles manufactured by a manufacturer
 licensed under Chapter 2301, Occupations Code.
 SECTION 2.  The heading to Section 521.008, Transportation
 Code, as added by Chapter 1233 (S.B. 1729), Acts of the 83rd
 Legislature, Regular Session, 2013, is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 521.008.  [PILOT] PROGRAM REGARDING THE PROVISION OF
 RENEWAL AND DUPLICATE DRIVER'S LICENSE AND OTHER IDENTIFICATION
 CERTIFICATE SERVICES.
 SECTION 3.  Sections 521.008(a) and (a-1), Transportation
 Code, as added by Chapter 1233 (S.B. 1729), Acts of the 83rd
 Legislature, Regular Session, 2013, are amended to read as follows:
 (a)  The department may establish a [pilot] program for the
 provision of renewal and duplicate driver's license, election
 identification certificate, and personal identification
 certificate services in counties that enter into an agreement with
 the department under Subsection (a-1)[:
 [(1)     not more than three counties with a population of
 50,000 or less;
 [(2)     not more than three counties with a population of
 more than 50,000 but less than 1,000,001;
 [(3)     not more than two counties with a population of
 more than one million; and
 [(4)     notwithstanding Subdivisions (1)-(3), any county
 in which the department operates a driver's license office as a
 scheduled or mobile office].
 (a-1)  Under the [pilot] program, the department may enter
 into an agreement with the commissioners court of a county to permit
 county employees to provide services at a county office relating to
 the issuance of renewal and duplicate driver's licenses, election
 identification certificates, and personal identification
 certificates, including:
 (1)  taking photographs;
 (2)  administering vision tests;
 (3)  updating a driver's license, election
 identification certificate, or personal identification certificate
 to change a name, address, or photograph;
 (4)  distributing and collecting information relating
 to donations under Section 521.401;
 (5)  collecting fees; and
 (6)  performing other basic ministerial functions and
 tasks necessary to issue renewal and duplicate driver's licenses,
 election identification certificates, and personal identification
 certificates.
 SECTION 4.  Section 521.085(b), Transportation Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (b)  Subsection (a) does not prohibit a license holder from
 operating a lesser type of vehicle that is:
 (1)  a motorcycle described by Section
 521.001(a)(6-a); or
 (2)  a type of motorcycle defined by the department
 under Section 521.001(c) and designated by the department as
 qualifying for operation under this section.
 SECTION 5.  Subchapter I, Chapter 545, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 545.4165 to read as follows:
 Sec. 545.4165.  OPERATION OF CERTAIN MOTORCYCLES. A person
 may not operate a motorcycle described by Section
 521.001(a)(6-a)(C)(vii) on a public highway for which the posted
 speed limit is more than 45 miles per hour, except that the operator
 may cross an intersection with a public highway that has a posted
 speed limit of more than 45 miles per hour.
 SECTION 6.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1756 passed the Senate on
 April 28, 2015, by the following vote:  Yeas 30, Nays 1;
 May 28, 2015, Senate refused to concur in House amendments and
 requested appointment of Conference Committee; May 29, 2015, House
 granted request of the Senate; May 31, 2015, Senate adopted
 Conference Committee Report by the following vote:  Yeas 29,
 Nays 2.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1756 passed the House, with
 amendments, on May 22, 2015, by the following vote:  Yeas 134,
 Nays 0, three present not voting; May 29, 2015, House granted
 request of the Senate for appointment of Conference Committee;
 May 31, 2015, House adopted Conference Committee Report by the
 following vote:  Yeas 142, Nays 0, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor