Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1779 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/28/2015

                    By: Menéndez S.B. No. 1779
 (In the Senate - Filed March 13, 2015; March 24, 2015, read
 first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs;
 April 28, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 9,
 Nays 0; April 28, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the order of candidate names on a runoff expedited
 election ballot.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 203.013, Election Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (h) to read as follows:
 (h)  The order of the candidates' names on the runoff
 election ballot shall be the relative order of names on the original
 expedited election ballot.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *