Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1780 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/22/2015

                    By: Menéndez S.B. No. 1780
 (In the Senate - Filed March 13, 2015; March 24, 2015, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Intergovernmental
 Relations; April 22, 2015, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0; April 22, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the administration of rabies vaccine under a local
 rabies control program.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 826, Health and Safety
 Code, is amended by adding Section 826.018 to read as follows:
 Sec. 826.018.  LOCAL RABIES CONTROL PROGRAMS.  (a)  This
 section applies to a veterinarian who:
 (1)  is employed by a county or municipality; and
 (2)  administers or supervises the administration of
 rabies vaccine as part of a local rabies control program
 established by a county or municipality under this chapter.
 (b)  A veterinarian described by Subsection (a) is not
 required to establish a veterinarian-client-patient relationship
 before administering rabies vaccine or supervising the
 administration of rabies vaccine.
 (c)  To the extent of any conflict between this section and
 any other law or rule relating to the administration of rabies
 vaccine, this section controls.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *