Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1812 House Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    84R32048 AJA-F
 By: Kolkhorst, et al. S.B. No. 1812
 (Geren)
 Substitute the following for S.B. No. 1812:  No.


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to transparency in the reporting and public availability
 of information regarding eminent domain authority; providing a
 civil penalty.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 2206, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subchapter D to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER D. EMINENT DOMAIN AUTHORITY REPORTING; PUBLIC
 AVAILABILITY
 Sec. 2206.151.  APPLICABILITY. This subchapter applies to
 public and private entities, including common carriers, authorized
 by the state by a general or special law to exercise the power of
 eminent domain.
 Sec. 2206.152.  CREATION DATE. For the purposes of this
 subchapter, an entity described by Section 2206.151 is considered
 to have been created on:
 (1)  the earliest date on which the entity existed if
 the entity was authorized to exercise the power of eminent domain on
 that date; or
 (2)  the earliest date on which the entity was
 authorized to exercise the power of eminent domain if the entity did
 not have that authority on the earliest date on which the entity
 existed.
 Sec. 2206.153.  EMINENT DOMAIN DATABASE. (a)  The
 comptroller shall create and make accessible on an Internet website
 maintained by the comptroller an eminent domain database as
 provided by this section.
 (b)  The eminent domain database must include with respect to
 each entity described by Section 2206.151:
 (1)  the name of the entity;
 (2)  the entity's address and public contact
 information;
 (3)  the name of the appropriate officer or other
 person representing the entity and that person's contact
 information;
 (4)  the type of entity;
 (5)  each provision of law that grants the entity
 eminent domain authority;
 (6)  the focus or scope of the eminent domain authority
 granted to the entity;
 (7)  the earliest date on which the entity had the
 authority to exercise the power of eminent domain;
 (8)  the entity's taxpayer identification number, if
 any;
 (9)  whether the entity exercised the entity's eminent
 domain authority in the preceding calendar year by the filing of a
 condemnation petition under Section 21.012, Property Code; and
 (10)  the entity's Internet website address or, if the
 entity does not operate an Internet website, contact information to
 enable a member of the public to obtain information from the entity.
 (c)  The comptroller may consult with the appropriate
 officer of, or other person representing, each entity to obtain the
 information necessary to maintain the eminent domain database.
 (d)  To the extent information required in the eminent domain
 database is otherwise collected or maintained by a state agency or
 political subdivision, the comptroller may request and the state
 agency or political subdivision shall provide that information and
 any update to the information as necessary for inclusion in the
 eminent domain database.
 (e)  At least annually, the comptroller shall update
 information in the eminent domain database for each entity, as
 appropriate.
 (f)  To the extent possible, the comptroller shall present
 information in the eminent domain database in a manner that is
 searchable and intuitive to users. The comptroller may enhance and
 organize the presentation of the information through the use of
 graphical representations as the comptroller considers
 appropriate.
 (g)  The comptroller may not charge a fee to the public to
 access the eminent domain database.
 Sec. 2206.154.  REPORTING OF INFORMATION TO COMPTROLLER.
 (a)  Except as provided by Subsection (b), not later than February
 1 of each year, an entity described by Section 2206.151 shall submit
 to the comptroller a report containing records and other
 information specified by this subchapter for the purpose of
 providing the comptroller with information to maintain the eminent
 domain database under Section 2206.153. The entity shall submit
 the report in a form and in the manner prescribed by the
 comptroller.
 (a-1)  An entity described by Section 2206.151 created
 before and in existence for at least 180 days on September 1, 2015,
 shall submit the entity's initial report under Subsection (a) not
 later than February 1, 2016. An entity described by Section
 2206.151 created before and in existence for less than 180 days on
 September 1, 2015, shall submit the entity's initial report under
 Subsection (a) not later than the later of the 180th day after the
 date of the entity's creation or February 1, 2016. This subsection
 expires December 1, 2016.
 (b)  An entity described by Section 2206.151 created on or
 after September 1, 2015, is not required to submit the entity's
 initial report under Subsection (a) before the 180th day after the
 date of the entity's creation.
 (c)  In addition to the annual report required under
 Subsection (a), an entity described by Section 2206.151 shall
 report to the comptroller any changes to the entity's eminent
 domain authority information reported under this section not later
 than the 90th day after the date on which the change occurred.
 Sec. 2206.155.  PENALTIES FOR NONCOMPLIANCE. (a)  If an
 entity does not timely submit a report that complies with Section
 2206.154, the comptroller shall provide written notice to the
 entity:
 (1)  informing the entity of the entity's violation of
 that section; and
 (2)  notifying the entity that the entity will be
 subject to a penalty of $1,000 if the entity does not report the
 required information on or before the 30th day after the date the
 notice is provided.
 (b)  Not later than the 30th day after the date the
 comptroller provides notice to an entity under Subsection (a), the
 entity must report the required information.
 (c)  If an entity does not report the required information as
 prescribed by Subsection (b):
 (1)  the entity is liable to the state for a civil
 penalty of $1,000; and
 (2)  the comptroller shall provide written notice to
 the entity:
 (A)  informing the entity of the entity's
 liability for the penalty; and
 (B)  notifying the entity that if the entity does
 not report the required information on or before the 30th day after
 the date the notice is provided:
 (i)  the entity will be subject to an
 additional penalty of $1,000; and
 (ii)  the entity's noncompliance will be
 reflected in the eminent domain database maintained by the
 comptroller.
 (d)  Not later than the 30th day after the date the
 comptroller provides notice to an entity under Subsection (c), the
 entity must report the required information.
 (e)  If an entity does not report the required information as
 prescribed by Subsection (d):
 (1)  the entity is liable to the state for a civil
 penalty of $1,000; and
 (2)  the comptroller shall:
 (A)  reflect the entity's noncompliance in the
 database required by this subchapter by including the entity on a
 separately maintained list of noncomplying entities and in any
 other manner determined appropriate by the comptroller until the
 entity reports all information required under Section 2206.154; and
 (B)  provide written notice to the entity that the
 entity's noncompliance will be reflected in the database until the
 entity reports the required information.
 (f)  The attorney general may sue to collect a civil penalty
 imposed by this section.
 Sec. 2206.156.  EMINENT DOMAIN AUTHORITY NOT AFFECTED. The
 reporting, failure to report, or late submission of a report by a
 public or private entity, including a common carrier, under this
 subchapter does not affect the entity's authority to exercise the
 power of eminent domain.
 Sec. 2206.157.  RULES. The comptroller may adopt rules and
 establish policies and procedures to implement this subchapter.
 SECTION 2.  The comptroller of public accounts shall create
 and post on an Internet website maintained by the comptroller the
 eminent domain database required by Section 2206.153, Government
 Code, as added by this Act, not later than September 1, 2016.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.