Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1821 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/13/2015

                    By: Campbell S.B. No. 1821
 (In the Senate - Filed March 13, 2015; March 25, 2015, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Finance; April 13, 2015,
 reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 11, Nays 1;
 April 13, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a local option exemption from ad valorem taxation of a
 portion of the appraised value of real property of a business that
 employs honorably discharged veterans.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 11, Tax Code, is amended by
 adding Section 11.37 to read as follows:
 Sec. 11.37.  CERTAIN BUSINESSES EMPLOYING VETERANS. (a)  In
 this section:
 (1)  "Qualifying business" means a business located in
 this state that on or after January 1, 2016:
 (A)  hires at least one veteran; and
 (B)  provides full-time employment to that
 veteran for a period of at least 12 consecutive months.
 (2)  "Veteran" means an individual who:
 (A)  has served on active duty in the armed forces
 of the United States; and
 (B)  was honorably discharged from military
 service.
 (b)  Subject to Subsection (c), a person is entitled to an
 exemption from taxation of a portion, expressed as a dollar amount,
 of the appraised value of real property the person owns that is
 reasonably necessary for and used by the person in the operation of
 a qualifying business if the exemption is adopted by the governing
 body of the taxing unit.
 (c)  The amount of the exemption adopted as provided by
 Subsection (b) may not exceed $15,000 of the appraised value of the
 property for each veteran employed by the qualifying business.
 (d)  The chief appraiser may require a person seeking an
 exemption under this section to present additional information
 establishing eligibility for the exemption.
 (e)  The governing body of the taxing unit may repeal the
 exemption in the manner provided by law for official action by the
 governing body.
 SECTION 2.  This Act applies only to ad valorem taxes imposed
 for a tax year that begins on or after the effective date of this
 Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect January 1, 2016, but only
 if the constitutional amendment proposed by the 84th Legislature,
 Regular Session, 2015, authorizing the governing body of a
 political subdivision to adopt a local option exemption from ad
 valorem taxation of a portion, expressed as a dollar amount, of the
 market value of real property of a business that employs honorably
 discharged veterans is approved by the voters. If that amendment is
 not approved by the voters, this Act has no effect.
 * * * * *