Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1824 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Campbell S.B. No. 1824
 (In the Senate - Filed March 13, 2015; March 25, 2015, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Veteran Affairs and
 Military Installations; April 8, 2015, reported adversely, with
 favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 6, Nays
 0; April 8, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1824 By:  Campbell


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to awarding the Texas Legislative Medal of Honor.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 437.351(d), Government Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (d)  The legislature by concurrent resolution may direct the
 governor to award the Texas Legislative Medal of Honor to a service
 member nominated by the nominating committee.  The committee chairs
 serving on the nominating committee shall jointly prepare a
 concurrent resolution directing the governor to award the medal to
 a service member nominated.  The legislature may direct the medal to
 be awarded only during a regular session [and may not, during a
 regular session, direct the medal to be awarded to more than:
 [(1)     one service member for service in the state or
 federal military forces during the period beginning after 1835 but
 before 1956; and
 [(2)     one service member for service in the state or
 federal military forces after 1955].
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *