S.B. No. 1824 AN ACT relating to a study and report on the awarding of the Texas Legislative Medal of Honor. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. (a) The standing committees of both houses of the legislature with primary jurisdiction over military and veterans affairs shall conduct a joint study on the nomination and selection process for the award of the Texas Legislative Medal of Honor. The study must evaluate: (1) the military tradition for a medal of honor and methods to ensure that the Texas Legislative Medal of Honor upholds that military tradition; (2) how a service member is nominated and methods to ensure that the service member is nominated based only on the merit of the service performed by the service member; and (3) a process by which the adjutant general may evaluate the qualifications of nominees for the Texas Legislative Medal of Honor. (b) Not later than December 1, 2016, the standing committees of both houses of the legislature with primary jurisdiction over military and veterans affairs shall jointly submit to the governor, the lieutenant governor, and the legislature a written report that summarizes the findings of the study conducted under Subsection (a) of this section. SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2015. ______________________________ ______________________________ President of the Senate Speaker of the House I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1824 passed the Senate on April 30, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 30, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. ______________________________ Secretary of the Senate I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1824 passed the House, with amendment, on May 27, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 144, Nays 0, two present not voting. ______________________________ Chief Clerk of the House Approved: ______________________________ Date ______________________________ Governor