Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1844 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/20/2015

                    By: Zaffirini S.B. No. 1844
 (In the Senate - Filed March 13, 2015; March 25, 2015, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Business and Commerce;
 April 20, 2015, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 20, 2015,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1844 By:  Huffines


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the establishment and functions of the Interagency Data
 Transparency Commission.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subtitle B, Title 10, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Chapter 2060 to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 2060. INTERAGENCY DATA TRANSPARENCY COMMISSION
 Sec. 2060.001.  DEFINITION. In this chapter, "commission"
 means the Interagency Data Transparency Commission.
 Sec. 2060.002.  COMMISSION CREATED. The commission is
 created to study and review:
 (1)  the current public data structure,
 classification, sharing, and reporting protocols for state
 agencies; and
 (2)  the possibility of collecting and posting data
 from state agencies online in an open source format that is
 machine-readable, exportable, and easily accessible by the public.
 Sec. 2060.003.  STUDY. The study conducted by the
 commission must consider methods to:
 (1)  structure, classify, and share data among state
 agencies;
 (2)  more efficiently gather and process data;
 (3)  collect and post data online in an open source
 format that is machine-readable, exportable, and easily accessible
 by the public;
 (4)  standardize data across state agencies;
 (5)  incorporate reporting practices by state agencies
 into the open data systems of the state;
 (6)  improve coordination of interagency data;
 (7)  improve sharing of data between state agencies;
 (8)  reduce the costs of collecting data;
 (9)  reduce duplicative data and information;
 (10)  increase accountability and ensure state
 agencies share and report the data collected by the state agencies;
 (11)  improve information management and analysis to:
 (A)  increase information security;
 (B)  uncover fraud and waste;
 (C)  reduce costs incurred by state agencies;
 (D)  improve operations performed by state
 agencies; and
 (E)  verify compliance with applicable laws; and
 (12)  determine other data and transparency issues.
 Sec. 2060.004.  REPORT. (a)  Not later than September 1,
 2016, the commission shall provide to the governor, lieutenant
 governor, and speaker of the house of representatives a final
 report on data reporting practices by state agencies. The report
 must include:
 (1)  recommendations for efficient and effective
 solutions under the commission's charge under Section 2060.003, in
 addition to solutions to other data and transparency issues
 identified by the commission;
 (2)  proposals for legislation necessary to implement
 the recommendations described by Subdivision (1);
 (3)  administrative recommendations; and
 (4)  a complete explanation of each of the commission's
 recommendations.
 (b)  The commission shall provide any additional reports
 requested by the governor, lieutenant governor, or speaker of the
 house of representatives.
 Sec. 2060.005.  MEMBERS OF THE COMMISSION. (a)  The
 commission is composed of the following members:
 (1)  two representatives from the Department of
 Information Resources, appointed by the executive director of the
 department;
 (2)  a representative of the Texas Legislative Council,
 appointed by the executive director of the council;
 (3)  a representative of the Legislative Budget Board,
 appointed by the director of the board;
 (4)  a member of each committee of the house of
 representatives and the senate with primary jurisdiction over
 information resources, appointed by the chair of each committee;
 (5)  the chair of the State Agency Coordinating
 Committee established by the Department of Information Resources,
 or a member of the committee appointed by the chair;
 (6)  a representative of the comptroller, appointed by
 the comptroller;
 (7)  a representative appointed by the governor, who
 serves as the presiding officer of the commission;
 (8)  a representative appointed by the lieutenant
 governor; and
 (9)  a representative appointed by the speaker of the
 house of representatives.
 (b)  A commission member is not entitled to reimbursement of
 expenses or to compensation.
 (c)  A vacancy on the commission shall be filled as soon as
 practicable in the same manner as the original appointment.
 Sec. 2060.006.  ASSISTANCE BY STATE AGENCIES.  The
 comptroller or a state agency with a representative on the
 commission shall provide any assistance the commission requires to
 perform the commission's duties.
 SECTION 2.  (a)  Each appointing official shall appoint
 members to the Interagency Data Transparency Commission not later
 than December 31, 2015.
 (b)  The Interagency Data Transparency Commission shall meet
 not later than the 30th day after the date the final initial
 appointment is made under Section 2060.005, Government Code, as
 added by this Act, and shall meet regularly as necessary at the call
 of the presiding officer.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *