Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1877 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Zaffirini S.B. No. 1877
 (In the Senate - Filed March 13, 2015; March 25, 2015, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Business and Commerce;
 April 20, 2015, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 20, 2015,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1877 By:  Watson


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the development and maintenance by each state agency of
 a data use agreement for the state agency's employees and to
 training related to that agreement.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter F, Chapter 2054, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 2054.134 to read as follows:
 Sec. 2054.134.  DATA USE AGREEMENT. (a)  Each state agency
 shall develop a data use agreement for use by the agency that meets
 the particular needs of the agency and is consistent with rules
 adopted by the department that relate to information security
 standards for state agencies.
 (b)  A state agency shall update the data use agreement at
 least biennially, but may update the agreement at any time as
 necessary to accommodate best practices in data management.
 (c)  A state agency shall distribute the data use agreement
 developed under this section, and each update to that agreement, to
 employees of the agency. An employee of the agency shall sign the
 data use agreement distributed and each update to the agreement.
 (d)  To the extent possible, a state agency shall provide
 employees of the agency with cybersecurity awareness training to
 coincide with the distribution of:
 (1)  the data use agreement required under this
 section; and
 (2)  each biennial update to that agreement.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *