S.B. No. 1878 AN ACT relating to a study on the feasibility of implementing more secure access requirements for certain electronically stored information held by the state. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. STUDY OF IDENTIFICATION AND ACCESS MANAGEMENT. The Department of Information Resources shall conduct a study to determine the feasibility of implementing new identification and access requirements for accessing certain information that is electronically stored by the state, including personal identifying information and sensitive personal information, as those terms are defined by Section 521.002, Business & Commerce Code. SECTION 2. COLLABORATION WITH OTHER AGENCIES. In conducting the study, the Department of Information Resources shall collaborate with other agencies to consider the needs or concerns specific to those agencies. SECTION 3. SCOPE OF STUDY. The study must: (1) examine the relative costs and benefits of various forms of identification and access management, including multifactor authentication; and (2) develop a strategy by which the Department of Information Resources may most effectively negotiate for bulk purchase across agencies at the lowest cost to the state. SECTION 4. REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. (a) The Department of Information Resources shall issue a written report to the governor, the lieutenant governor, and the speaker of the house of representatives that includes the department's evaluation of the available identification and access management and multifactor authentication systems and programs and provides recommendations regarding department action or legislation that will secure sensitive information held by the state. (b) The report must be issued not later than November 30, 2016. SECTION 5. EXPIRATION. This Act expires December 1, 2016. SECTION 6. EFFECTIVE DATE. This Act takes effect September 1, 2015. ______________________________ ______________________________ President of the Senate Speaker of the House I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1878 passed the Senate on April 30, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. ______________________________ Secretary of the Senate I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1878 passed the House on May 22, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 139, Nays 1, two present not voting. ______________________________ Chief Clerk of the House Approved: ______________________________ Date ______________________________ Governor