Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1889 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/20/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 1889


 AN ACT
 relating to the definition of neglect of a child, the exclusion of
 certain information from the Department of Family and Protective
 Services central registry of child abuse or neglect cases, and the
 report of certain information regarding those cases to the
 legislature.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 261.001(4), Family Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (4)  "Neglect":
 (A)  includes:
 (i) [(A)]  the leaving of a child in a
 situation where the child would be exposed to a substantial risk of
 physical or mental harm, without arranging for necessary care for
 the child, and the demonstration of an intent not to return by a
 parent, guardian, or managing or possessory conservator of the
 child;
 (ii) [(B)]  the following acts or omissions
 by a person:
 (a) [(i)]  placing a child in or
 failing to remove a child from a situation that a reasonable person
 would realize requires judgment or actions beyond the child's level
 of maturity, physical condition, or mental abilities and that
 results in bodily injury or a substantial risk of immediate harm to
 the child;
 (b) [(ii)]  failing to seek, obtain,
 or follow through with medical care for a child, with the failure
 resulting in or presenting a substantial risk of death,
 disfigurement, or bodily injury or with the failure resulting in an
 observable and material impairment to the growth, development, or
 functioning of the child;
 (c) [(iii)]  the failure to provide a
 child with food, clothing, or shelter necessary to sustain the life
 or health of the child, excluding failure caused primarily by
 financial inability unless relief services had been offered and
 refused;
 (d) [(iv)]  placing a child in or
 failing to remove the child from a situation in which the child
 would be exposed to a substantial risk of sexual conduct harmful to
 the child; or
 (e) [(v)]  placing a child in or
 failing to remove the child from a situation in which the child
 would be exposed to acts or omissions that constitute abuse under
 Subdivision (1)(E), (F), (G), (H), or (K) committed against another
 child; or
 (iii) [(C)]  the failure by the person
 responsible for a child's care, custody, or welfare to permit the
 child to return to the child's home without arranging for the
 necessary care for the child after the child has been absent from
 the home for any reason, including having been in residential
 placement or having run away; and
 (B)  does not include the refusal by a person
 responsible for a child's care, custody, or welfare to permit the
 child to remain in or return to the child's home resulting in the
 placement of the child in the conservatorship of the department if:
 (i)  the child has a severe emotional
 disturbance;
 (ii)  the person's refusal is based solely on
 the person's inability to obtain mental health services necessary
 to protect the safety and well-being of the child; and
 (iii)  the person has exhausted all
 reasonable means available to the person to obtain the mental
 health services described by Subparagraph (ii).
 SECTION 2.  Section 261.002(b), Family Code, as amended by
 S.B. No. 219, Acts of the 84th Legislature, Regular Session, 2015,
 is amended to read as follows:
 (b)  The executive commissioner shall [may] adopt rules
 necessary to carry out this section.  The rules shall:
 (1)  prohibit the department from making a finding of
 abuse or neglect against a person in a case in which the department
 is named managing conservator of a child who has a severe emotional
 disturbance only because the child's family is unable to obtain
 mental health services for the child; and
 (2)  establish guidelines for reviewing the records in
 the registry and removing those records in which the department was
 named managing conservator of a child who has a severe emotional
 disturbance only because the child's family was unable to obtain
 mental health services for the child [provide for cooperation with
 local child service agencies, including hospitals, clinics, and
 schools, and cooperation with other states in exchanging reports to
 effect a national registration system].
 SECTION 3.  Section 262.352, Family Code, is amended to read
 as follows:
 Sec. 262.352.  JOINT MANAGING CONSERVATORSHIP OF CHILD.
 (a)  Before the department files a suit affecting the parent-child
 relationship requesting managing conservatorship [a person
 relinquishes custody] of a child who suffers from a severe
 emotional disturbance in order to obtain mental health services for
 the child, the department must, unless [if] it is not in the best
 interest of the child, discuss with the child's parent or legal
 guardian [person relinquishing custody of the child] the option of
 seeking a court order for joint managing conservatorship of the
 child with the department.
 (b)  Not later than November 1 of each even-numbered year,
 the department shall report the following information to the
 legislature:
 (1)  with respect to children described by Subsection
 (a):
 (A)  the number of children for whom the
 department has been appointed managing conservator;
 (B)  the number of children for whom the
 department has been appointed joint managing conservator; and
 (C)  the number of children who were diverted to
 community or residential mental health services through another
 agency; and
 (2)  the number of persons whose names were entered
 into the central registry of cases of child abuse and neglect only
 because the department was named managing conservator of a child
 who has a severe emotional disturbance because the child's family
 was unable to obtain mental health services for the child.
 (c)  Subsection (b) and this subsection expire September 1,
 2019.
 SECTION 4.  Section 262.353, Family Code, is repealed.
 SECTION 5.  The Department of Family and Protective Services
 shall implement the changes in law made by this Act using funds
 appropriated to the department for the state fiscal biennium ending
 August 31, 2017.
 SECTION 6.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1889 passed the Senate on
 April 30, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 20, 2015, by the
 following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1889 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 14, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 146,
 Nays 0, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor