Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1913 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/30/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 1913


 AN ACT
 relating to a court administrator in certain counties.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  The heading to Section 75.401, Government Code,
 is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 75.401.  COURT ADMINISTRATOR SYSTEM FOR DISTRICT AND
 STATUTORY COUNTY COURTS IN CERTAIN COUNTIES.
 SECTION 2.  Sections 75.401(a), (b), (c), (d), and (e),
 Government Code, are amended to read as follows:
 (a)  In a county that has more than one district court or
 statutory [county criminal court or more than one] county court [at
 law having both criminal and civil jurisdiction], those courts may
 establish and maintain, on approval of the commissioners court, a
 court administrator system.
 (b)  The judges of the district courts [county criminal
 courts] or the statutory county courts may [at law having both
 criminal and civil jurisdiction shall] by local rule designate
 local court divisions and the duties of the court administrator for
 each division, if applicable.  The court administrator shall
 cooperate with regional, presiding, and local [the] administrative
 judges and state agencies having duties relating to the operation
 of the courts to promote uniform and efficient administration of
 justice.
 (c)  The court administrator is appointed by the judges of
 the district courts or [county criminal courts or] the statutory
 county courts served by the court administrator.  The court
 administrator [at law having both criminal and civil jurisdiction
 and] serves at the pleasure of those [the] judges.
 (d)  A court administrator is entitled to reasonable
 compensation, as determined by the judges served and in the salary
 range for the position, as set by the commissioners court.
 (e)  The judges of the courts served by the court
 administrator, with the approval of the commissioners court, shall
 appoint appropriate staff and support personnel according to the
 needs of the local jurisdiction.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1913 passed the Senate on
 May 8, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that the
 Senate concurred in House amendment on May 30, 2015, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1913 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 27, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 144,
 Nays 0, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor