Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1918 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/30/2015

                    By: Watson S.B. No. 1918
 (In the Senate - Filed March 13, 2015; March 25, 2015, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Transportation;
 April 30, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 8,
 Nays 0; April 30, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the use of certain lighting equipment on motorcycles.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter D, Chapter 547, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 547.306 to read as follows:
 Sec. 547.306.  LED GROUND EFFECT LIGHTING EQUIPMENT ON
 MOTORCYCLE. (a)  In this section, "LED ground effect lighting
 equipment" means light emitting diode (LED) technology that is
 attached to the underbody of a motorcycle for the purpose of
 illuminating:
 (1)  the body of the motorcycle; or
 (2)  the ground below the motorcycle.
 (b)  A person may operate a motorcycle equipped with LED
 ground effect lighting that emits a non-flashing amber or white
 light.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *