Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1925 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD    Austin, Texas      FISCAL NOTE, 84TH LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION            April 19, 2015      TO: Honorable Joan Huffman, Chair, Senate Committee on State Affairs      FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:SB1925 by West (Relating to the dedication of revenue received from certain court costs to the truancy prevention and diversion fund.), As Introduced   Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for SB1925, As Introduced: a negative impact of ($5,396,972) through the biennium ending August 31, 2017; in the same period, there will be an increase of an equivalent amount to the new Truancy Prevention and Diversion Fund associated with the General Revenue reduction.  The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill. 

LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Austin, Texas
FISCAL NOTE, 84TH LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION
April 19, 2015





  TO: Honorable Joan Huffman, Chair, Senate Committee on State Affairs      FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:SB1925 by West (Relating to the dedication of revenue received from certain court costs to the truancy prevention and diversion fund.), As Introduced  

TO: Honorable Joan Huffman, Chair, Senate Committee on State Affairs
FROM: Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board
IN RE: SB1925 by West (Relating to the dedication of revenue received from certain court costs to the truancy prevention and diversion fund.), As Introduced

 Honorable Joan Huffman, Chair, Senate Committee on State Affairs 

 Honorable Joan Huffman, Chair, Senate Committee on State Affairs 

 Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board

 Ursula Parks, Director, Legislative Budget Board

SB1925 by West (Relating to the dedication of revenue received from certain court costs to the truancy prevention and diversion fund.), As Introduced

SB1925 by West (Relating to the dedication of revenue received from certain court costs to the truancy prevention and diversion fund.), As Introduced

Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for SB1925, As Introduced: a negative impact of ($5,396,972) through the biennium ending August 31, 2017; in the same period, there will be an increase of an equivalent amount to the new Truancy Prevention and Diversion Fund associated with the General Revenue reduction.  The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill. 

Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for SB1925, As Introduced: a negative impact of ($5,396,972) through the biennium ending August 31, 2017; in the same period, there will be an increase of an equivalent amount to the new Truancy Prevention and Diversion Fund associated with the General Revenue reduction. 

The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill.

General Revenue-Related Funds, Five-Year Impact:  Fiscal Year Probable Net Positive/(Negative) Impact to General Revenue Related Funds  2016 ($2,698,486)   2017 ($2,698,486)   2018 ($2,698,486)   2019 ($2,698,486)   2020 ($2,698,486)    


2016 ($2,698,486)
2017 ($2,698,486)
2018 ($2,698,486)
2019 ($2,698,486)
2020 ($2,698,486)

 All Funds, Five-Year Impact:  Fiscal Year Probable Revenue (Loss) fromGeneral Revenue Fund1  Probable Revenue Gain fromGeneral Revenue-Dedicated Truancy Prevention and Diversion Fund   2016 ($2,698,486) $2,698,486   2017 ($2,698,486) $2,698,486   2018 ($2,698,486) $2,698,486   2019 ($2,698,486) $2,698,486   2020 ($2,698,486) $2,698,486   

  Fiscal Year Probable Revenue (Loss) fromGeneral Revenue Fund1  Probable Revenue Gain fromGeneral Revenue-Dedicated Truancy Prevention and Diversion Fund   2016 ($2,698,486) $2,698,486   2017 ($2,698,486) $2,698,486   2018 ($2,698,486) $2,698,486   2019 ($2,698,486) $2,698,486   2020 ($2,698,486) $2,698,486  


2016 ($2,698,486) $2,698,486
2017 ($2,698,486) $2,698,486
2018 ($2,698,486) $2,698,486
2019 ($2,698,486) $2,698,486
2020 ($2,698,486) $2,698,486

Fiscal Analysis

The bill would re-enact portions of SB 1419, 83rd Legislature, Regular Session (2013), which established a court cost to fund grants for juvenile case manager services and prevention activities. Revenue would have been deposited to a new General Revenue-Dedicated Truancy Prevention and Diversion Fund; however, this fund was not exempt from funds consolidation by the 83rd Legislature. Revenue has therefore been deposited to the General Revenue Fund. The bill would create the General Revenue-Dedicated Truancy Prevention and Diversion Fund and deposit the revenue from the existing court cost to this fund instead of General Revenue. The bill authorizes the legislature to appropriate money from the General Revenue-Dedicated Truancy Prevention and Diversion Fund only to the Criminal Justice division of the Office of the Governor for distribution to local governmental entities for truancy prevention and intervention services.

Methodology

Collections from this court cost began on January 1, 2014. From that time through February 3, 2015, collections totaled $2,923,360. Assuming the same rate of collections were to continue, it is estimated the revenue collected from this court cost would be approximately $2.7 million per year.  The bill would result in a loss to General Revenue and an equivalent gain to the new General Revenue-Dedicated Truancy Prevention and Diversion Fund.

Local Government Impact

No fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.

Source Agencies: 212 Office of Court Administration, Texas Judicial Council, 301 Office of the Governor, 304 Comptroller of Public Accounts

212 Office of Court Administration, Texas Judicial Council, 301 Office of the Governor, 304 Comptroller of Public Accounts

LBB Staff: UP, AG, JJ, JQ, JPo

 UP, AG, JJ, JQ, JPo