Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB193 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 03/16/2015

                    By: Creighton S.B. No. 193
 (In the Senate - Filed November 25, 2014; January 27, 2015,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation;
 March 16, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 9,
 Nays 0; March 16, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the issuance of specialty license plates to honor
 recipients of certain military medals.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 504.315, Transportation Code, is amended
 by adding Subsections (j), (k), (l), and (m) to read as follows:
 (j)  The department shall issue specialty license plates for
 recipients of the Soldier's Medal.  License plates issued under
 this subsection must include the Soldier's Medal emblem and must
 include the words "Soldier's Medal" at the bottom of each plate.
 (k)  The department shall issue specialty license plates for
 recipients of the Navy and Marine Corps Medal.  License plates
 issued under this subsection must include the Navy and Marine Corps
 Medal emblem and must include the words "Navy and Marine Corps
 Medal" at the bottom of each plate.
 (l)  The department shall issue specialty license plates for
 recipients of the Coast Guard Medal.  License plates issued under
 this subsection must include the Coast Guard Medal emblem and must
 include the words "Coast Guard Medal" at the bottom of each plate.
 (m)  The department shall issue specialty license plates for
 recipients of the Airman's Medal.  License plates issued under this
 subsection must include the Airman's Medal emblem and must include
 the words "Airman's Medal" at the bottom of each plate.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *