Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1934 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/29/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 1934


 AN ACT
 relating to requirements for the issuance of a driver's license or
 personal identification certificate and to a study on digital
 identification and proof of licensure.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 521.044(a), Transportation Code, as
 amended by Chapters 1012 (H.B. 2512) and 1105 (H.B. 3787), Acts of
 the 83rd Legislature, Regular Session, 2013, is reenacted and
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  Information provided on a driver's license or personal
 identification certificate application that relates to the
 applicant's social security number may be used only by the
 department or disclosed only to:
 (1)  the child support enforcement division of the
 attorney general's office;
 (2)  another state entity responsible for enforcing the
 payment of child support;
 (3)  the United States Selective Service System as
 provided by Section 521.147;
 (4)  the unclaimed property division of the
 comptroller's office; [or]
 (5)  the Health and Human Services Commission;
 (6) [(5)]  the secretary of state for the purposes of
 voter registration or the administration of elections; or
 (7)  an agency of another state responsible for issuing
 driver's licenses or identification documents.
 SECTION 2.  Sections 521.044(b) and (e), Transportation
 Code, are amended to read as follows:
 (b)  The department shall enter an applicant's social
 security number in the department's electronic database but may not
 print the number on the applicant's driver's license or personal
 identification certificate.
 (e)  The department shall include in the department's
 legislative appropriations requests and budgets, in quarterly
 performance reports, and in audits of the department's local
 offices performance measures on the percentage of complete and
 correct social security numbers on driver's licenses and personal
 identification certificates.
 SECTION 3.  Section 521.101(f), Transportation Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (f)  A personal identification certificate:
 (1)  for an applicant who is a citizen, national, or
 legal permanent resident of the United States or a refugee or asylee
 lawfully admitted into the United States,[:
 [(A)]  expires on a date specified by the
 department [if the applicant is younger than 60 years of age; or
 [(B)     does not expire if the applicant is 60 years
 of age or older]; or
 (2)  for an applicant not described by Subdivision (1),
 expires on:
 (A)  the earlier of:
 (i)  a date specified by the department; or
 (ii)  the expiration date of the applicant's
 authorized stay in the United States; or
 (B)  the first anniversary of the date of
 issuance, if there is no definite expiration date for the
 applicant's authorized stay in the United States.
 SECTION 4.  Section 521.142(g), Transportation Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (g)  The department shall [may] require an applicant to
 provide the applicant's social security number or proof that the
 applicant is not eligible for a social security number [only for a
 purpose permitted by Section 521.044].
 SECTION 5.  Subchapter I, Chapter 521, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 521.183 to read as follows:
 Sec. 521.183.  SURRENDER OF DRIVER'S LICENSE OR PERSONAL
 IDENTIFICATION CERTIFICATE.  (a)  A person is not entitled to
 receive a driver's license until the person surrenders to the
 department each personal identification certificate in the
 person's possession that was issued by this state.
 (b)  A person is not entitled to receive a personal
 identification certificate until the person surrenders to the
 department each driver's license in the person's possession that
 was issued by this state.
 SECTION 6.  Chapter 411, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subchapter Z to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER Z. MISCELLANEOUS PROVISIONS
 Sec. 411.951.  STUDY ON DIGITAL IDENTIFICATION AND PROOF OF
 LICENSURE. (a)  The department shall conduct a study:
 (1)  determining the feasibility of altering state
 requirements for the issuance of a driver's license to allow a
 person to use a digital form of a driver's license displayed on an
 electronic device to prove that the person has a driver's license;
 (2)  evaluating risks to personal information security
 that a system described by Subdivision (1) might create; and
 (3)  surveying and evaluating electronic driver's
 license policies in other states.
 (b)  Not later than September 1, 2016, the department shall
 submit a detailed report of its findings and recommendations to the
 legislature.
 (c)  This section expires January 1, 2017.
 SECTION 7.  The changes in law made by this Act apply only to
 a driver's license or personal identification certificate for which
 an application is submitted on or after the effective date of this
 Act.  A driver's license or personal identification certificate for
 which an application was submitted before the effective date of
 this Act is governed by the law as it existed immediately before the
 effective date of this Act, and that law is continued in effect for
 that purpose.
 SECTION 8.  To the extent of any conflict, this Act prevails
 over another Act of the 84th Legislature, Regular Session, 2015,
 relating to nonsubstantive additions to and corrections in enacted
 codes.
 SECTION 9.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1934 passed the Senate on
 May 5, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 24, Nays 7; and that the
 Senate concurred in House amendment on May 29, 2015, by the
 following vote: Yeas 26, Nays 5.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1934 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 27, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 88,
 Nays 57, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor