Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1940 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/28/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 1940


 AN ACT
 relating to the creation of a joint interim committee to undertake a
 study of health benefit plans administered by the Teacher
 Retirement System of Texas.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  CREATION OF JOINT INTERIM COMMITTEE. (a)  A
 joint interim committee is created to study and review the health
 benefit plans, including TRS-Care and TRS-ActiveCare, operated
 under Chapters 1575 and 1579, Insurance Code, and propose reforms
 to address issues described by Section 2 of this Act.
 (b)  The joint interim committee shall be composed of three
 senators appointed by the lieutenant governor and three members of
 the house of representatives appointed by the speaker of the house
 of representatives.
 (c)  The lieutenant governor and speaker of the house of
 representatives shall each designate a co-chair from among the
 joint interim committee members.
 (d)  The joint interim committee shall convene at the joint
 call of the co-chairs.
 (e)  The joint interim committee has all other powers and
 duties provided to a special or select committee by the rules of the
 senate and house of representatives, by Subchapter B, Chapter 301,
 Government Code, and by policies of the senate and house committees
 on administration.
 SECTION 2.  INTERIM STUDY REGARDING CERTAIN HEALTH BENEFIT
 PLANS. The joint interim committee created by Section 1 of this Act
 shall study the health benefit plans, including TRS-Care and
 TRS-ActiveCare, operated under Chapters 1575 and 1579, Insurance
 Code, to examine and assess the following issues:
 (1)  the financial soundness of the plans;
 (2)  the cost and affordability of plan coverage to
 persons eligible for coverage under the plans; and
 (3)  the sufficiency of access to physicians and health
 care providers under the plans.
 SECTION 3.  COMMITTEE FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS.
 (a)  Not later than January 15, 2017, the joint interim committee
 shall report the committee's findings and recommendations to the
 lieutenant governor, the speaker of the house of representatives,
 and the governor. The joint interim committee shall include in its
 recommendations specific statutory and regulatory changes that
 appear necessary from the results of the committee's study under
 Section 2 of this Act.
 (b)  Not later than the 60th day after the effective date of
 this Act, the lieutenant governor and speaker of the house of
 representatives shall appoint the members of the joint interim
 committee created under Section 1 of this Act in accordance with
 that section.
 SECTION 4.  ABOLITION OF COMMITTEE. The joint interim
 committee created by this Act is abolished and this Act expires
 January 20, 2017.
 SECTION 5.  EFFECTIVE DATE. This Act takes effect
 immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members
 elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas
 Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for
 immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1940 passed the Senate on
 May 15, 2015, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1940 passed the House on
 May 27, 2015, by the following vote:  Yeas 144, Nays 0, two
 present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor