Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2019 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/20/2015

                    By: Uresti S.B. No. 2019
 (In the Senate - Filed March 27, 2015; March 30, 2015, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice;
 April 20, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 7,
 Nays 0; April 20, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the composition of the Texas Violent Gang Task Force.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Article 61.10(f), Code of Criminal Procedure, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (f)  The task force shall consist of:
 (1)  a representative of the Department of Public
 Safety designated by the director of that agency;
 (2)  two representatives of the Texas Department of
 Criminal Justice, including a representative of the parole
 division, designated by the executive director of that agency;
 (3)  a representative of the office of the inspector
 general of the Texas Department of Criminal Justice designated by
 the inspector general;
 (4)  two representatives [a representative] of the
 Texas Juvenile Justice Department [Youth Commission] designated by
 the executive director of that agency;
 (5)  [a representative of the Texas Juvenile Probation
 Commission designated by the executive director of that agency;
 [(6)]  a representative of the office of the attorney
 general designated by the attorney general;
 (6) [(7)]  six representatives who are local law
 enforcement officers or local community supervision personnel,
 including juvenile probation personnel, designated by the
 governor; [and]
 (7) [(8)]  two representatives who are local
 prosecutors designated by the governor; and
 (8)  a representative of the Texas Alcoholic Beverage
 Commission designated by the executive director of that agency.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *