Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2041 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/23/2015

                    By: Seliger S.B. No. 2041
 (In the Senate - Filed April 8, 2015; April 9, 2015, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Transportation;
 April 23, 2015, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; April 23, 2015,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 2041 By:  Taylor of Collin


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the designation of the portion of State Highway 191 in
 Midland County as the Sergeant Michael Naylor Memorial Highway.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 225, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 225.102 to read as follows:
 Sec. 225.102.  SERGEANT MICHAEL NAYLOR MEMORIAL HIGHWAY.
 (a)  The portion of State Highway 191 in Midland County is
 designated as the Sergeant Michael Naylor Memorial Highway.
 (b)  Subject to Section 225.021(c), the department shall:
 (1)  design and construct markers indicating the
 designation as the Sergeant Michael Naylor Memorial Highway and any
 other appropriate information; and
 (2)  erect a marker at each end of the highway and at
 appropriate intermediate sites along the highway.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *