Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2041 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/29/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 2041


 AN ACT
 relating to the designation of the portion of State Highway 191 in
 Midland County as the Sergeant Michael Naylor Memorial Highway and
 of the portion of Interstate Highway 30 in Rockwall County as the
 Congressman Ralph Hall Highway.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 225, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Sections 225.102 and 225.103 to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 225.102.  SERGEANT MICHAEL NAYLOR MEMORIAL HIGHWAY.
 (a)  The portion of State Highway 191 in Midland County is
 designated as the Sergeant Michael Naylor Memorial Highway.
 (b)  Subject to Section 225.021(c), the department shall:
 (1)  design and construct markers indicating the
 designation as the Sergeant Michael Naylor Memorial Highway and any
 other appropriate information; and
 (2)  erect a marker at each end of the highway and at
 appropriate intermediate sites along the highway.
 Sec. 225.103.  CONGRESSMAN RALPH HALL HIGHWAY.
 (a)  Notwithstanding Section 225.001(c), the portion of Interstate
 Highway 30 in Rockwall County is designated as the Congressman
 Ralph Hall Highway.  The designation is in addition to any other
 designation.
 (b)  Subject to Section 225.021(c), the department shall:
 (1)  design and construct markers indicating the
 designation as the Congressman Ralph Hall Highway and any other
 appropriate information; and
 (2)  erect a marker at each end of the highway and at
 appropriate intermediate sites along the highway.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 2041 passed the Senate on
 May 5, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that the
 Senate concurred in House amendment on May 28, 2015, by the
 following vote: Yeas 29, Nays 2.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 2041 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 22, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 140,
 Nays 0, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor