Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2042 Introduced / Bill

Filed 04/09/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    84R12617 JRJ-D
 By: Schwertner, Kolkhorst S.B. No. 2042


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the board of trustees of the Blinn Junior College
 District.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter E, Chapter 130, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 130.0827 to read as follows:
 Sec. 130.0827.  ADDITIONAL TRUSTEES FOR BLINN JUNIOR COLLEGE
 DISTRICT. (a)  Notwithstanding any other law, in addition to the
 members of the board of trustees of the Blinn Junior College
 District elected or appointed under other provisions of this
 subchapter, the commissioners court of each county in which a
 branch campus of the district with a student enrollment greater
 than 10,000 is located shall appoint two members to serve on the
 district's board of trustees.
 (b)  Members of the board of trustees appointed under this
 section serve staggered six-year terms, with the term of one member
 expiring on February 1 every three years.
 (b-1)  In appointing the initial members under this section,
 the commissioners court shall designate one of the members to serve
 a term expiring February 1, 2018, and the other member to serve a
 term expiring February 1, 2021.  This subsection expires January 1,
 2022.
 (c)  Members of the board of trustees appointed under this
 section may participate in the decision-making of the board to the
 same extent as any other member of the board except that members of
 the board appointed under this section by the commissioners court
 of a county that is not located in the Blinn Junior College
 District:
 (1)  may participate in the decision-making of the
 board only in matters not related to the imposition of a tax or the
 distribution of revenue raised from a tax; and
 (2)  are counted for purposes of determining whether a
 quorum of the board is present only for the purpose of Subdivision
 (1).
 SECTION 2.  The commissioners court of each county to which
 Section 130.0827, Education Code, as added by this Act, applies
 shall appoint the initial members of the board of trustees of the
 Blinn Junior College District under that section not later than
 December 31, 2015.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.