Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB228 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Creighton, Nichols S.B. No. 228
 (In the Senate - Filed December 5, 2014; January 28, 2015,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Finance;
 April 23, 2015, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 12, Nays 1; April 23, 2015,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 228 By:  Kolkhorst


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to an exemption from the sales tax for firearms and hunting
 supplies for a limited period.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter H, Chapter 151, Tax Code, is amended
 by adding Section 151.358 to read as follows:
 Sec. 151.358.  FIREARMS AND HUNTING SUPPLIES FOR LIMITED
 PERIOD. (a)  In this section, "hunting supplies" means ammunition,
 archery equipment, hunting blinds and stands, hunting decoys,
 firearm cleaning supplies, gun cases and gun safes, hunting optics,
 and hunting safety equipment.
 (b)  The sale of a firearm or hunting supplies is exempted
 from the taxes imposed by this chapter if the sale takes place
 during a period:
 (1)  beginning at 12:01 a.m. on the Saturday of the last
 full weekend in August and ending at 12 midnight on the following
 Sunday; or
 (2)  beginning at 12:01 a.m. on the Saturday of the last
 full weekend in October and ending at 12 midnight on the following
 Sunday.
 SECTION 2.  (a)  Notwithstanding Section 151.358(b)(1), Tax
 Code, as added by this Act, if this Act takes effect September 1,
 2015, the exemption provided by that subdivision from the taxes
 imposed by Chapter 151, Tax Code, applies to a sale that takes place
 during a period beginning at 12:01 a.m. on the Friday before the
 first full weekend in September 2015 and ending at 12 midnight on
 the following Sunday if the sale otherwise meets the requirements
 of that section.
 (b)  If this Act receives the vote necessary for immediate
 effect as provided by Section 4 of this Act, this section has no
 effect.
 (c)  If this section takes effect, this section expires
 October 1, 2015.
 SECTION 3.  The change in law made by this Act does not
 affect tax liability accruing before the effective date of this
 Act. That liability continues in effect as if this Act had not been
 enacted, and the former law is continued in effect for the
 collection of taxes due and for civil and criminal enforcement of
 the liability for those taxes.
 SECTION 4.  Except as otherwise provided by this Act, this
 Act takes effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of
 all the members elected to each house, as provided by Section 39,
 Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this Act does not receive the
 vote necessary for immediate effect, this Act takes effect
 September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *