Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB251 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/15/2015

                    By: Ellis S.B. No. 251
 (In the Senate - Filed December 19, 2014; January 28, 2015,
 read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs;
 April 15, 2015, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 3; April 15, 2015,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 251 By:  Ellis


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to eligibility to serve as an interpreter in an election.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 61.032, Election Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 61.032.  INTERPRETER PERMITTED.  If an election officer
 who attempts to communicate with a voter does not understand the
 language used by the voter, the voter may communicate through an
 interpreter selected by the voter or, if the voter has not selected
 an interpreter, an interpreter appointed by an election officer.
 SECTION 2.  Section 61.033, Election Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 61.033.  ELIGIBILITY TO SERVE AS INTERPRETER. To be
 eligible to serve as an interpreter, a person:
 (1)  if selected by the voter, may be any person other
 than the voter's employer, an agent of the voter's employer, or an
 officer or agent of a labor union to which the voter belongs; or
 (2)  if appointed to serve as an interpreter by an
 election officer, must be a registered voter of the county in which
 the voter needing the interpreter resides or a registered voter of
 an adjacent county.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *