Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB265 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/29/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 265


 AN ACT
 relating to student use of sunscreen products in public schools.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter A, Chapter 38, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 38.021 to read as follows:
 Sec. 38.021.  USE OF SUNSCREEN PRODUCTS. (a) A student may
 possess and use a topical sunscreen product while on school
 property or at a school-related event or activity to avoid
 overexposure to the sun and not for the medical treatment of an
 injury or illness if the product is approved by the federal Food and
 Drug Administration for over-the-counter use.
 (b)  This section does not:
 (1)  waive any immunity from liability of a school
 district, its board of trustees, or its employees; or
 (2)  create any liability for or a cause of action
 against a school district, its board of trustees, or its employees.
 SECTION 2.  This Act applies beginning with the 2015-2016
 school year.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 265 passed the Senate on
 April 22, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 28, Nays 2; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 29, 2015, by the
 following vote: Yeas 29, Nays 2.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 265 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 26, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 144,
 Nays 0, three present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor