Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB289 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 03/18/2015

                    By: Estes S.B. No. 289
 (In the Senate - Filed January 8, 2015; January 28, 2015, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Agriculture, Water, and
 Rural Affairs; March 18, 2015, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 0; March 18, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the licensure or certification of volunteer
 firefighters and members of industrial emergency response teams.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter Z, Chapter 419, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 419.910 to read as follows:
 Sec. 419.910.  CERTAIN REGULATION PROHIBITED.  (a)  In this
 section:
 (1)  "State agency" has the meaning assigned by Section
 2103.001.
 (2)  "Volunteer firefighter" means a member of a
 volunteer fire department who is not a full-time paid employee.
 (b)  A state agency may not:
 (1)  require a volunteer firefighter to obtain a
 license or certification in order to be a volunteer firefighter; or
 (2)  require a member of an industrial emergency
 response team to obtain a license or certification in order to be a
 member of an industrial emergency response team.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *