Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB293 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 03/31/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 293


 AN ACT
 relating to a clarification of the law governing eligibility of
 certain events for funding under the Major Events trust fund.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 5A(a)(5), Chapter 1507 (S.B. 456), Acts
 of the 76th Legislature, Regular Session, 1999 (Article 5190.14,
 Vernon's Texas Civil Statutes), is amended to read as follows:
 (5)  "Site selection organization" means:
 (A)  the National Football League, the National
 Collegiate Athletic Association, the National Basketball
 Association, ESPN or an affiliate, the National Hockey League,
 Major League Baseball, the Federation Internationale de Football
 Association (FIFA), the International World Games Association, the
 National Association for Stock Car Auto Racing (NASCAR), or the
 United States Olympic Committee;
 (B)  the national governing body of a sport that
 is recognized by the United States Olympic Committee, the National
 Thoroughbred Racing Association, Formula One Management Limited,
 or the Federation Internationale de l'Automobile;
 (C)  the Academy of Country Music;
 (D)  the National Cutting Horse Association; [or]
 (E)  the Republican National Committee or the
 Democratic National Committee; or
 (F)  the Ultimate Fighting Championship.
 SECTION 2.  The amendment made by this Act to Section 5A(a),
 Chapter 1507 (S.B. 456), Acts of the 76th Legislature, Regular
 Session, 1999 (Article 5190.14, Vernon's Texas Civil Statutes), is
 intended only to clarify existing law, as amended by Chapter 1371
 (S.B. 1678), Acts of the 83rd Legislature, Regular Session, 2013,
 on the eligibility of certain events to receive funding from the
 Major Events trust fund.  Each event held on or after the effective
 date of S.B. 1678, 83rd Legislature, Regular Session, 2013, and the
 event's eligibility to receive funding from the Major Events trust
 fund, are governed by the law as clarified by this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 293 passed the Senate on
 March 23, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 28, Nays 3; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on March 31, 2015, by the
 following vote: Yeas 27, Nays 3.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 293 passed the House, with
 amendment, on March 30, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 114,
 Nays 27, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor