Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB313 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Seliger S.B. No. 313
 (In the Senate - Filed January 15, 2015; February 2, 2015,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Education;
 April 29, 2015, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 10, Nays 0; April 29, 2015,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 313 By:  Bettencourt


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the essential knowledge and skills of the required
 public school curriculum and the administration and reports
 relating to assessment instruments administered to public school
 students.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter A, Chapter 28, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 28.0025 to read as follows:
 Sec. 28.0025.  REVIEW AND MODIFICATION OF ESSENTIAL
 KNOWLEDGE AND SKILLS. (a)  The State Board of Education shall:
 (1)  conduct a review of the essential knowledge and
 skills of the foundation curriculum subjects under Section
 28.002(a)(1); and
 (2)  modify the essential knowledge and skills of the
 foundation curriculum subjects to narrow the content and scope of
 standards and skills for each subject and grade level in accordance
 with this section.
 (b)  In complying with this section, the State Board of
 Education shall consider:
 (1)  for each subject and grade level, the time:
 (A)  a teacher would require to provide
 comprehensive instruction on a particular standard or skill; and
 (B)  a typical student would require to master a
 particular standard or skill;
 (2)  whether, in light of the consideration required by
 Subdivision (1), each essential knowledge and skill of a subject
 can be comprehensively taught within the number of school days
 required under Section 25.081, not including the number of days
 required for testing;
 (3)  the college and career readiness standards, and
 whether inclusion of part of those standards in the essential
 knowledge and skills of a subject is possible; and
 (4)  whether an assessment instrument administered
 under Section 39.023 adequately assesses a particular standard or
 skill.
 (c)  In establishing or following an established timeline
 for reviewing and modifying the essential knowledge and skills as
 required under this section, the State Board of Education shall
 ensure that the timeline reflects a priority to first review and
 modify a subject for which an end-of-course assessment instrument
 under Section 39.023(c) is administered before a subject for which
 an assessment instrument under Section 39.023(a) is administered.
 The board shall complete the review and modification of the
 essential knowledge and skills for each applicable subject and
 grade level as required under this section not later than September
 1, 2018.
 (d)  Until the review and modification under this section is
 complete, the State Board of Education may not add to or modify the
 content and scope of standards and skills for any subject in the
 foundation curriculum under Section 28.002(a)(1) unless
 modifications are made in accordance with this section.
 (e)  This section expires September 1, 2018.
 SECTION 2.  Section 28.008(d), Education Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (d)  The State Board of Education shall incorporate college
 readiness standards and expectations approved by the commissioner
 of education and the Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board
 under Subsection (b) into the essential knowledge and skills
 identified by the board under Section 28.002(c). The State Board of
 Education shall develop and by rule adopt a chart that clearly
 indicates the alignment of the college readiness standards and
 expectations with the essential knowledge and skills identified by
 the board under Section 28.002(c).
 SECTION 3.  Subchapter A, Chapter 28, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 28.0081 to read as follows:
 Sec. 28.0081.  ADMINISTRATION OF ASSESSMENT INSTRUMENT FOR
 DIAGNOSTIC PURPOSES.  (a)  Not later than April 1 of each school
 year, a school district shall administer an assessment instrument
 designated by the Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board under
 Section 51.3062(c) to each student in the district enrolled in the
 10th grade.  A student's performance on the assessment instrument
 may only be used for diagnostic purposes, including a determination
 as to whether a student should be enrolled in developmental
 education courses. If a student is in a special education program
 under Subchapter A, Chapter 29, the student's admission, review,
 and dismissal committee shall determine if it is appropriate for
 the student to be administered the assessment instrument required
 under this section.
 (b)  This section applies only until the State Board of
 Education has completed the review and modification of essential
 knowledge and skills of the foundation curriculum subjects required
 by Section 28.0025.  This section expires September 1, 2018.
 SECTION 4.  Subchapter B, Chapter 39, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 39.0239 to read as follows:
 Sec. 39.0239.  REQUIRED REPORT FOR CERTAIN ASSESSMENTS.
 (a)  Following the administration of an assessment instrument
 adopted or developed under Section 39.023(a), the agency shall
 provide a detailed report of a student's performance on the
 assessment instrument to:
 (1)  the student;
 (2)  the student's parent or other person standing in
 parental relationship; and
 (3)  the student's teachers.
 (b)  The report provided under Subsection (a) must include an
 analysis of a student's performance on each assessed standard or
 skill in the essential knowledge and skills of the subject for which
 the assessment instrument was administered. The analysis must
 indicate whether the student mastered each standard or skill
 assessed in the assessment instrument.
 (c)  The analysis under Subsection (b) must demonstrate both
 individual assessment results and assessment results aggregated
 across classes, campuses, and districts.
 (d)  The commissioner may contract with a third party to
 fulfill the requirements of this section.
 SECTION 5.  Not later than January 1, 2016, the State Board
 of Education shall adopt a chart as prescribed by Section
 28.008(d), Education Code, as amended by this Act.
 SECTION 6.  This Act applies beginning with the 2015-2016
 school year.
 SECTION 7.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *