Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB318 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/26/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 318


 AN ACT
 relating to the amount the Texas Military Preparedness Commission
 may grant to local governmental entities for certain purposes.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Sections 436.202(a), (b), and (c), Government
 Code, are amended to read as follows:
 (a)  From money appropriated for this purpose, the
 commission may make a grant to an eligible local governmental
 entity to:
 (1)  enable the entity to match money or meet an
 investment requirement necessary to receive federal assistance
 provided to the local governmental entity for responding to or
 recovering from an event described by Section 436.201(b);
 (2)  match the entity's contribution for a purpose
 described by Section 436.203 at a closed or realigned defense
 facility; [or]
 (3)  construct infrastructure and other projects
 necessary to accommodate a new, [or] expanded, or retained military
 mission at a military base or to reduce the impact of an action of
 the United States Department of Defense that will negatively impact
 a defense facility located in or near the entity; or
 (4)  construct infrastructure and other projects
 necessary to prevent the reduction or closing of a defense
 facility.
 (b)  The commission may not make a grant for an amount less
 than $50,000 or an amount more than the lesser of:
 (1)  50 percent of the amount of matching money or
 investment that the local governmental entity is required to
 provide, subject to Subsection (c);
 (2)  50 percent of the local governmental entity's
 investment for purposes described by Section 436.203 if federal
 assistance is unavailable; or
 (3)  $5 [$2] million.
 (c)  If the local governmental entity demonstrates to the
 commission that, because of a limited budget, the entity lacks the
 resources necessary to provide 50 percent of the amount of matching
 money or investment that the entity is required to provide, the
 commission may make a grant in an amount of not more than 80 percent
 of the amount of that matching money or investment requirement but
 may not make a grant in an amount that exceeds $5 [$2] million.
 SECTION 2.  Section 436.203(c), Government Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (c)  An eligible local governmental entity described by
 Section 436.201(a)(3), [or] (4), or (5) may use the proceeds of the
 grant to purchase or lease equipment to train defense workers whose
 jobs have been threatened or lost because of an event described by
 Section 436.201(b) or to train workers to support the mission at
 military installations or defense facilities.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 318 passed the Senate on
 March 17, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 27, Nays 3; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 26, 2015, by the
 following vote: Yeas 24, Nays 7.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 318 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 20, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 139,
 Nays 5, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor