Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB344 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 03/25/2015

                    By: Huffman S.B. No. 344
 (In the Senate - Filed January 23, 2015; February 2, 2015,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice;
 March 25, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 5,
 Nays 0; March 25, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the prosecution of the offense of online solicitation
 of a minor.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 33.021(a)(1), Penal Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (1)  "Minor" means:
 (A)  an individual who is [represents himself or
 herself to be] younger than 17 years of age; or
 (B)  an individual whom the actor believes to be
 younger than 17 years of age.
 SECTION 2.  Section 33.021, Penal Code, is amended by
 amending Subsections (b), (d), and (e) to read as follows:
 (b)  A person who is 17 years of age or older commits an
 offense if, with the intent to commit an offense listed in Article
 62.001(5)(A), (B), or (K), Code of Criminal Procedure [arouse or
 gratify the sexual desire of any person], the person, over the
 Internet, by electronic mail or text message or other electronic
 message service or system, or through a commercial online service,
 intentionally:
 (1)  communicates in a sexually explicit manner with a
 minor; or
 (2)  distributes sexually explicit material to a minor.
 (d)  It is not a defense to prosecution under Subsection (c)
 that[:
 [(1)]  the meeting did not occur[;
 [(2)     the actor did not intend for the meeting to occur;
 or
 [(3)     the actor was engaged in a fantasy at the time of
 commission of the offense].
 (e)  It is a defense to prosecution under this section that
 at the time conduct described by Subsection [(b) or] (c) was
 committed:
 (1)  the actor was married to the minor; or
 (2)  the actor was not more than three years older than
 the minor and the minor consented to the conduct.
 SECTION 3.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to an offense committed on or after the effective date of this Act.
 An offense committed before the effective date of this Act is
 governed by the law in effect on the date the offense was committed,
 and the former law is continued in effect for that purpose. For
 purposes of this section, an offense was committed before the
 effective date of this Act if any element of the offense occurred
 before that date.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *