Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB374 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Schwertner S.B. No. 374
 (In the Senate - Filed January 28, 2015; February 2, 2015,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Business and Commerce;
 May 5, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 5,
 Nays 2; May 5, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to requiring state agencies to participate in the federal
 electronic verification of employment authorization program, or
 E-verify.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subtitle B, Title 6, Government Code, is amended
 by adding Chapter 673 to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 673.  VERIFICATION OF EMPLOYEE INFORMATION
 Sec. 673.001.  DEFINITIONS.  In this chapter:
 (1)  "E-verify program" means the electronic
 verification of employment authorization program of the federal
 Illegal Immigration Reform and Immigrant Responsibility Act of 1996
 (Pub. L. No. 104-208, reprinted in note, 8 U.S.C. Section 1324a),
 operated by the United States Department of Homeland Security, or a
 successor employment authorization program designated by the
 United States Department of Homeland Security or other federal
 agency authorized to verify the employment authorization status of
 newly hired employees under the federal Immigration Reform and
 Control Act of 1986 (8 U.S.C. Section 1101 et seq.).
 (2)  "State agency" has the meaning assigned by Section
 659.101.
 Sec. 673.002.  VERIFICATION.  A state agency shall register
 and participate in the E-verify program to verify information of
 all new employees.
 Sec. 673.003.  RULES.  The Texas Workforce Commission shall
 adopt rules and prescribe forms to implement this chapter.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *