Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB386 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Taylor of Collin S.B. No. 386
 (In the Senate - Filed January 28, 2015; February 2, 2015,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Higher Education;
 April 7, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 6,
 Nays 0; April 7, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the appointment of school marshals by public junior
 colleges.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Articles 2.127(a) and (d), Code of Criminal
 Procedure, are amended to read as follows:
 (a)  Except as provided by Subsection (b), a school marshal
 may make arrests and exercise all authority given peace officers
 under this code, subject to written regulations adopted by the
 board of trustees of a school district, [or] the governing body of
 an open-enrollment charter school, or the governing board of a
 public junior college under Section 37.0811, Education Code, and
 only act as necessary to prevent or abate the commission of an
 offense that threatens serious bodily injury or death of students,
 faculty, or visitors on school premises.
 (d)  A person may not serve as a school marshal unless the
 person is:
 (1)  licensed under Section 1701.260, Occupations
 Code; and
 (2)  appointed by the board of trustees of a school
 district, [or] the governing body of an open-enrollment charter
 school, or the governing board of a public junior college under
 Section 37.0811, Education Code.
 SECTION 2.  Sections 37.0811(a), (b), (c), and (f),
 Education Code, are amended to read as follows:
 (a)  The board of trustees of a school district, [or] the
 governing body of an open-enrollment charter school, or the
 governing board of a public junior college may appoint not more than
 one school marshal per 400 students in average daily attendance per
 campus.
 (b)  The board of trustees of a school district, [or] the
 governing body of an open-enrollment charter school, or the
 governing board of a public junior college may select for
 appointment as a school marshal under this section an applicant who
 is an employee of the school district, [or] open-enrollment charter
 school, or public junior college and certified as eligible for
 appointment under Section 1701.260, Occupations Code.  The board of
 trustees, [or] governing body, or governing board may, but shall
 not be required to, reimburse the amount paid by the applicant to
 participate in the training program under that section.
 (c)  A school marshal appointed by the board of trustees of a
 school district, [or] the governing body of an open-enrollment
 charter school, or the governing board of a public junior college
 may carry or possess a handgun on the physical premises of a school,
 but only:
 (1)  in the manner provided by written regulations
 adopted by the board of trustees, [or] the governing body, or the
 governing board; and
 (2)  at a specific school as specified by the board of
 trustees, [or] governing body, or governing board, as applicable.
 (f)  A school district, [or] charter school, or public junior
 college employee's status as a school marshal becomes inactive on:
 (1)  expiration of the employee's school marshal
 license under Section 1701.260, Occupations Code;
 (2)  suspension or revocation of the employee's license
 to carry a concealed handgun issued under Subchapter H, Chapter
 411, Government Code;
 (3)  termination of the employee's employment with the
 district, [or] charter school, or public junior college; or
 (4)  notice from the board of trustees of the district,
 [or] the governing body of the charter school, or the governing
 board of the public junior college that the employee's services as
 school marshal are no longer required.
 SECTION 3.  Sections 1701.260(a) and (j), Occupations Code,
 are amended to read as follows:
 (a)  The commission shall establish and maintain a training
 program open to any employee of a school district, [or]
 open-enrollment charter school, or public junior college who holds
 a license to carry a concealed handgun issued under Subchapter H,
 Chapter 411, Government Code.  The training may be conducted only by
 the commission staff or a provider approved by the commission.
 (j)  The commission shall submit the identifying information
 collected under Subsection (b) for each person licensed by the
 commission under this section to:
 (1)  the director of the Department of Public Safety;
 (2)  the person's employer, if the person is employed by
 a school district, [or] open-enrollment charter school, or public
 junior college;
 (3)  the chief law enforcement officer of the local
 municipal law enforcement agency if the person is employed at a
 campus of a school district, [or] open-enrollment charter school,
 or public junior college located within a municipality;
 (4)  the sheriff of the county if the person is employed
 at a campus of a school district, [or] open-enrollment charter
 school, or public junior college that is not located within a
 municipality; and
 (5)  the chief administrator of any peace officer
 commissioned under Section 37.081, Education Code, if the person is
 employed at a school district that has commissioned a peace officer
 under that section.
 SECTION 4.  Section 1701.001(8), Occupations Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (8)  "School marshal" means a person employed and
 appointed by the board of trustees of a school district, [or] the
 governing body of an open-enrollment charter school, or the
 governing board of a public junior college under Article 2.127,
 Code of Criminal Procedure, and in accordance with and having the
 rights provided by Section 37.0811, Education Code.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *