Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB394 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 03/30/2015

                    By: Perry S.B. No. 394
 (In the Senate - Filed January 28, 2015; February 2, 2015,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Agriculture, Water,
 and Rural Affairs; March 30, 2015, reported adversely, with
 favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 6,
 Nays 0; March 30, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 394 By:  Perry


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the use of supplemental environmental projects by a
 local government to come into compliance with environmental laws or
 remediate environmental harm caused by the local government.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Sections 7.067(a-1) and (a-2), Water Code, are
 amended to read as follows:
 (a-1)  For a respondent that is a local government, the [The]
 commission:
 (1)  may approve a supplemental environmental project
 that is necessary to bring the [a] respondent into compliance with
 environmental laws or that is necessary to remediate environmental
 harm caused by the local government's [respondent's] alleged
 violation; and
 (2)  shall approve a supplemental environmental
 project described by Subdivision (1) if the local government:
 (A)  has not previously committed a violation at
 the same site with the same underlying cause in the preceding five
 years, as documented in a commission order; and
 (B)  did not agree, before the date that the
 commission initiated the enforcement action, to perform the project
 [if the respondent is a local government].
 (a-2)  The commission shall develop a policy to prevent
 regulated entities from systematically avoiding compliance through
 the use of supplemental environmental projects under Subsection
 (a-1)(1) [Subsection (a-1)], including a requirement for an
 assessment of:
 (1)  the respondent's financial ability to pay
 administrative penalties;
 (2)  the ability of the respondent to remediate the
 harm or come into compliance; and
 (3)  the need for corrective action.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *