Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB397 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/13/2015

                    By: Rodríguez S.B. No. 397
 (In the Senate - Filed January 29, 2015; February 2, 2015,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Veteran Affairs and
 Military Installations; April 13, 2015, reported adversely, with
 favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 6,
 Nays 1; April 13, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 397 By:  Rodríguez


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the marketing and advertising of the veterans'
 assistance lottery game.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 466.027, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subsections (d-1) and (f) and amending Subsection (e) to
 read as follows:
 (d-1)  The commission shall produce and place printed
 point-of-sale advertising materials promoting the lottery game
 operated under this section at each licensed location that provides
 appropriate, lottery-dedicated space to display the materials.
 (e)  The commission shall include on the commission's
 Internet website a dedicated page that:
 (1)  features the game operated under this section;
 (2)  provides information on the benefits provided to
 veterans through funding from the game; and
 (3)  is accessible by a prominent link on the main page
 of the commission's website.
 (f)  No organization that would otherwise be eligible to
 receive funds from the state lottery account attributable to any
 lottery game authorized by this section may receive any such funds
 if it conducts illegal gambling or the illegal operation of
 gambling devices as defined by Chapter 47, Penal Code, or allows
 illegal gambling or the illegal operation of gambling devices to be
 conducted on its property or in its facilities.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *