By: Seliger S.B. No. 413 (In the Senate - Filed January 29, 2015; February 4, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Agriculture, Water, and Rural Affairs; April 7, 2015, reported adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 7, Nays 0; April 7, 2015, sent to printer.) Click here to see the committee vote COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 413 By: Perry A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to the qualifications for membership on the Texas Water Development Board. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Sections 6.052(a) and (b), Water Code, are amended to read as follows: (a) The board is composed of three members who are appointed by the governor with the advice and consent of the senate. One member must have experience in the field of engineering, one member must have experience in the field of public or private finance, and one member must: (1) be actively engaged in the business of farming or animal husbandry or another business related to agriculture; and (2) wholly or partly own or lease land used in connection with a business described by Subdivision (1) [have experience in the field of law or business]. (b) The governor shall make the appointments in such a manner that the members: (1) reflect the diverse geographic regions and population groups of this state, provided that one member resides in a rural area and is a registered voter of a county with a population of less than 355,000; and (2) do not have any conflicts of interest prohibited by state or federal law. SECTION 2. Section 6.054, Water Code, is amended by adding Subsection (e) to read as follows: (e) Notwithstanding Subsection (a)(2), a board member who resided in a county with a population of less than 355,000 at the time the member was appointed may not be removed on the ground that the population of the county no longer meets that requirement. SECTION 3. The changes in law made by this Act relating to the qualifications for membership on the Texas Water Development Board do not affect the eligibility of a member of the board serving immediately before the effective date of this Act to continue to serve on the board for the term to which the member was appointed. Not later than February 1, 2019, the governor shall appoint members of the board as necessary to ensure that the composition of the board complies with Section 6.052, Water Code, as amended by this Act. SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2015. * * * * *