Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB415 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Watson S.B. No. 415
 (In the Senate - Filed January 29, 2015; February 4, 2015,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation;
 March 9, 2015, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; March 9, 2015,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 415 By:  Huffines


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the designation of a portion of Farm-to-Market Road 685
 in Travis County as the Deputy Jessica Hollis Memorial Highway.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 225, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 225.104 to read as follows:
 Sec. 225.104.  DEPUTY JESSICA HOLLIS MEMORIAL HIGHWAY.
 (a)  The portion of Farm-to-Market Road 685 in Travis County that
 runs south from State Highway 130 to East Pecan Street is designated
 as Deputy Jessica Hollis Memorial Highway.
 (b)  Subject to Section 225.021(c), the department shall:
 (1)  design and construct markers indicating the
 designation as the Deputy Jessica Hollis Memorial Highway and any
 other appropriate information; and
 (2)  erect a marker at each end of the highway and at
 appropriate intermediate sites along the highway.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *