Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB418 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Whitmire S.B. No. 418
 (In the Senate - Filed January 30, 2015; February 4, 2015,
 read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs;
 February 9, 2015, rereferred to Committee on Criminal Justice;
 April 20, 2015, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 0; April 20, 2015,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 418 By:  Whitmire


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to requests by the State Commission on Judicial Conduct
 for certain records held by court reporters.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 33.030, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (c) to read as follows:
 (c)  If an official court reporter has a backup audio media
 recording of a court proceeding, the court reporter on request of
 the commission shall produce to the commission at no cost to the
 commission a true and correct copy of the backup audio media
 recording.
 SECTION 2.  Section 52.046, Government Code, as amended by
 this Act, applies only to conduct that occurs on or after the
 effective date of this Act.  Conduct that occurs before the
 effective date of this Act is governed by the law in effect on the
 date the conduct occurred, and the former law is continued in effect
 for that purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 15, 2015.
 * * * * *