Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB432 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 03/31/2015

                    By: West S.B. No. 432
 (In the Senate - Filed February 3, 2015; February 9, 2015,
 read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs;
 March 31, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 9,
 Nays 0; March 31, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to continuation of an additional fee for filing civil
 cases in certain Dallas County courts.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Sections 51.705(f) and (h), Government Code, are
 amended to read as follows:
 (f)  A resolution adopted under Subsection (e) continues
 from year to year until July 1, 2030 [2016], allowing the county to
 collect fees under the terms of this section until the resolution is
 rescinded.
 (h)  A fee established under a particular resolution is
 abolished on the earlier of:
 (1)  the date a resolution adopted under Subsection (e)
 is rescinded as provided by Subsection (g); or
 (2)  July 1, 2030 [2016].
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *