Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB45 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Zaffirini, Uresti S.B. No. 45
 (In the Senate - Filed November 10, 2014; January 26, 2015,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation;
 March 4, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 7,
 Nays 0; March 4, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the designation of a portion of Interstate Highway 37 as
 the Trooper Terry Wayne Miller Memorial Highway.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 225, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 225.103 to read as follows:
 Sec. 225.103.  TROOPER TERRY WAYNE MILLER MEMORIAL HIGHWAY.
 (a)  The portion of Interstate Highway 37 in Atascosa County
 between mile marker 102 and mile marker 115 is designated as the
 Trooper Terry Wayne Miller Memorial Highway. The designation is in
 addition to any other designation.
 (b)  Subject to Section 225.021(c), the department shall:
 (1)  design and construct markers indicating the
 highway number, the designation as the Trooper Terry Wayne Miller
 Memorial Highway, and any other appropriate information; and
 (2)  erect a marker at each end of the highway and at
 appropriate intermediate sites along the highway.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *