Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB453 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 03/18/2015

                    By: Seliger S.B. No. 453
 (In the Senate - Filed February 4, 2015; February 9, 2015,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Higher Education;
 March 18, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 6,
 Nays 0; March 18, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to minimum scores required for public school students to
 receive credit by an examination administered through the
 College-Level Examination Program.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 28.023(c-1), Education Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (c-1)  A school district shall give a student in grade level
 six or above credit for a subject if the student scores:
 (1)  a three or higher on an advanced placement
 examination approved by the board of trustees under Subsection (a)
 and developed by the College Board; or
 (2)  a scaled score of 50 [60] or higher on an
 examination approved by the board of trustees under Subsection (a)
 and administered through the College-Level Examination Program.
 SECTION 2.  This Act applies beginning with the 2015-2016
 school year.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *