Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB455 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/28/2015

                    By: Creighton S.B. No. 455
 (In the Senate - Filed February 4, 2015; February 9, 2015,
 read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs;
 April 28, 2015, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 28, 2015,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 455 By:  Schwertner


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to special three-judge district courts convened to hear
 certain cases.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subtitle A, Title 2, Government Code, is amended
 by adding Chapter 22A to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 22A.  SPECIAL THREE-JUDGE DISTRICT COURT
 Sec. 22A.001.  ELIGIBLE PROCEEDINGS. (a)  The attorney
 general may petition the chief justice of the supreme court to
 convene a special three-judge district court in any suit filed in a
 district court in this state in which this state or a state officer
 or agency is a defendant in a claim that:
 (1)  challenges the finances or operations of this
 state's public school system; or
 (2)  involves the apportionment of districts for the
 house of representatives, the senate, the State Board of Education,
 or the United States Congress, or state judicial districts.
 (b)  A petition filed by the attorney general under this
 section stays all proceedings in the district court in which the
 original case was filed until the chief justice of the supreme court
 acts on the petition.
 (c)  Within a reasonable time after receipt of a petition
 from the attorney general under Subsection (a), the chief justice
 of the supreme court shall grant the petition and issue an order
 transferring the case to a special three-judge district court
 convened as provided by Section 22A.002.
 Sec. 22A.002.  SPECIAL THREE-JUDGE DISTRICT COURT.  (a)  On
 receipt of a petition under Section 22A.001, the chief justice
 shall order a special three-judge district court to convene and
 shall appoint three persons to serve on the court as follows:
 (1)  the district judge of the judicial district to
 which the original case was assigned;
 (2)  one district judge of a judicial district other
 than a judicial district in the same county as the judicial district
 to which the original case was assigned; and
 (3)  one justice of a court of appeals other than:
 (A)  the court of appeals in the court of appeals
 district in which the original case was assigned; or
 (B)  a court of appeals district in which the
 district judge appointed under Subdivision (2) sits.
 (b)  A judge or justice appointed under Subsection (a)(2) or
 (3) must have been elected to that office and may not be serving an
 appointed term of office.
 (c)  A special three-judge district court convened under
 this section shall conduct all hearings in the district court to
 which the original case was assigned and may use the courtroom,
 other facilities, and administrative support of the district court.
 (d)  The Office of Court Administration of the Texas Judicial
 System shall pay the travel expenses and other incidental costs
 related to convening a special three-judge district court under
 this chapter.
 Sec. 22A.003.  CONSOLIDATION OF RELATED ACTIONS. (a)  In
 this section, "related case" means any case in which this state or a
 state officer or agency is a defendant that arises from the same
 nucleus of operative facts as the claim before a special
 three-judge district court under this chapter, regardless of the
 legal claims or causes of action asserted in the related case.
 (b)  On the motion of any party to a case assigned to a
 special three-judge district court under Section 22A.002, the court
 by order shall consolidate with the cause of action before the court
 any related case pending in any district court or other court in
 this state.
 (c)  A case consolidated under Subsection (b) must be
 transferred to the special three-judge district court if the court
 finds that transfer is necessary.  The transfer may occur without
 the consent of the parties to the related case or of the court in
 which the related case is pending.
 Sec. 22A.004.  APPLICATION OF TEXAS RULES OF CIVIL
 PROCEDURE. (a)  Except as provided by this section, the Texas
 Rules of Civil Procedure and all other statutes and rules
 applicable to civil litigation in a district court in this state
 apply to proceedings before a special three-judge district court.
 (b)  The supreme court may adopt rules for the operation of a
 special three-judge district court convened under this chapter and
 for the procedures of the court.
 Sec. 22A.005.  ACTIONS BY JUDGE OR JUSTICE. (a)  With the
 unanimous consent of the three judges sitting on a special
 three-judge district court, a judge or justice of the court may:
 (1)  independently conduct pretrial proceedings; and
 (2)  enter interlocutory orders before trial.
 (b)  A judge or justice of a special three-judge district
 court may not independently enter a temporary restraining order,
 temporary injunction, or any order that finally disposes of a claim
 before the court.
 (c)  Any independent action taken by one judge or justice of
 a special three-judge district court related to a claim before the
 court may be reviewed by the entire court at any time before final
 judgment.
 Sec. 22A.006.  APPEAL. (a)  An appeal from an appealable
 interlocutory order or final judgment of a special three-judge
 district court is to the supreme court.
 (b)  The supreme court may adopt rules for appeals from a
 special three-judge district court.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *