Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB479 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Schwertner S.B. No. 479
 (In the Senate - Filed February 6, 2015; February 10, 2015,
 read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs;
 April 15, 2015, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 15, 2015,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 479 By:  Schwertner


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to establishing actual progress for the purposes of
 determining the right to repurchase real property from a condemning
 entity.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 21.101, Property Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (b) and adding Subsection (b-1) to read as
 follows:
 (b)  In this section, "actual progress" means the completion
 of three [two] or more of the following actions:
 (1)  the performance of a significant amount of labor
 to develop the property or other property acquired for the same
 public use project for which the property owner's property was
 acquired;
 (2)  the provision of a significant amount of materials
 to develop the property or other property acquired for the same
 public use project for which the property owner's property was
 acquired;
 (3)  the hiring of and performance of a significant
 amount of work by an architect, engineer, or surveyor to prepare a
 plan or plat that includes the property or other property acquired
 for the same public use project for which the property owner's
 property was acquired;
 (4)  application for state or federal funds to develop
 the property or other property acquired for the same public use
 project for which the property owner's property was acquired; or
 (5)  application for a state or federal permit to
 develop the property or other property acquired for the same public
 use project for which the property owner's property was acquired.
 (b-1)  Notwithstanding Subsection (b), for a navigation
 district or port authority, "actual progress" means:
 (1)  the completion of one action described by
 Subsection (b); and
 (2)  [; (6)     the acquisition of a tract or parcel of
 real property adjacent to the property for the same public use
 project for which the owner's property was acquired; or
 [(7)  for a governmental entity,] the adoption by a
 majority of the entity's governing body at a public hearing of a
 development plan for a public use project that indicates that the
 entity will not complete more than one action described by
 Subsection (b) [Subdivisions (1)-(6)] before the 10th anniversary
 of the date of acquisition of the property.
 SECTION 2.  Section 21.101, Property Code, as amended by
 this Act, applies only to a real property interest acquired in
 connection with a condemnation proceeding in which the petition is
 filed on or after the effective date of this Act.  A real property
 interest acquired in connection with a condemnation proceeding in
 which the petition is filed before the effective date of this Act is
 governed by the law in effect immediately before that date, and that
 law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *