Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB481 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/23/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 481


 AN ACT
 relating to consumer information concerning facility-based
 physicians and notice and availability of mediation for balance
 billing by a facility-based physician.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 324.001(8), Health and Safety Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (8)  "Facility-based physician" means a radiologist,
 an anesthesiologist, a pathologist, an emergency department
 physician, [or] a neonatologist, or an assistant surgeon.
 SECTION 2.  Section 1456.001(3), Insurance Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (3)  "Facility-based physician" means a radiologist,
 an anesthesiologist, a pathologist, an emergency department
 physician, [or] a neonatologist, or an assistant surgeon:
 (A)  to whom the facility has granted clinical
 privileges; and
 (B)  who provides services to patients of the
 facility under those clinical privileges.
 SECTION 3.  Section 1456.004(c), Insurance Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (c)  A facility-based physician who bills a patient covered
 by a preferred provider benefit plan or a health benefit plan under
 Chapter 1551 that does not have a contract with the facility-based
 physician shall send a billing statement to the patient that
 contains a conspicuous, plain-language explanation [with
 information sufficient to notify the patient] of the mandatory
 mediation process available under Chapter 1467 if the amount for
 which the enrollee is responsible to the physician, after
 copayments, deductibles, and coinsurance, including the amount
 unpaid by the administrator or insurer, is greater than $500
 [$1,000].
 SECTION 4.  Section 1467.001(4), Insurance Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (4)  "Facility-based physician" means a radiologist,
 an anesthesiologist, a pathologist, an emergency department
 physician, [or] a neonatologist, or an assistant surgeon:
 (A)  to whom the facility has granted clinical
 privileges; and
 (B)  who provides services to patients of the
 facility under those clinical privileges.
 SECTION 5.  Section 1467.051(a), Insurance Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (a)  An enrollee may request mediation of a settlement of an
 out-of-network health benefit claim if:
 (1)  the amount for which the enrollee is responsible
 to a facility-based physician, after copayments, deductibles, and
 coinsurance, including the amount unpaid by the administrator or
 insurer, is greater than $500 [$1,000]; and
 (2)  the health benefit claim is for a medical service
 or supply provided by a facility-based physician in a hospital that
 is a preferred provider or that has a contract with the
 administrator.
 SECTION 6.  Sections 1456.004(c) and 1467.051(a), Insurance
 Code, as amended by this Act, apply only to charges for a medical
 service or supply provided on or after the effective date of this
 Act. Charges for a medical service or supply provided before the
 effective date of this Act are governed by the law as it existed
 immediately before the effective date of this Act, and that law is
 continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 7.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 481 passed the Senate on
 April 9, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 28, Nays 3; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 22, 2015, by the
 following vote: Yeas 29, Nays 2.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 481 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 18, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 137,
 Nays 1, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor