Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB489 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Seliger S.B. No. 489
 (In the Senate - Filed February 9, 2015; February 10, 2015,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation;
 March 16, 2015, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; March 16, 2015,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 489 By:  Huffines


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the designation of a portion of U.S. Highway 87 in
 Howard County as the William B. Crooker Memorial Highway.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 225, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 225.102 to read as follows:
 Sec. 225.102.  WILLIAM B. CROOKER MEMORIAL HIGHWAY.
 (a)  Notwithstanding Section 225.001(c), the portion of U.S.
 Highway 87 under construction as of September 1, 2015, as a relief
 route around Big Spring, between Interstate Highway 20 and Ranch
 Road 33, in Howard County is designated as the William B. Crooker
 Memorial Highway.  The designation is in addition to any other
 designation.
 (b)  Subject to Section 225.021(c), the department shall:
 (1)  design and construct markers indicating the
 designation as the William B. Crooker Memorial Highway and any
 other appropriate information; and
 (2)  erect a marker at each end of the highway and at
 appropriate intermediate sites along the highway.
 SECTION 2.  The Texas Department of Transportation shall
 comply with Section 225.102, Transportation Code, as added by this
 Act, after the construction of the portion of U.S. Highway 87
 designated as the William B. Crooker Memorial Highway by this Act is
 complete.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *