Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB503 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/08/2015

                    By: Perry, Watson S.B. No. 503
 (In the Senate - Filed February 9, 2015; February 11, 2015,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Veteran Affairs and
 Military Installations; April 8, 2015, reported adversely, with
 favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 6,
 Nays 0; April 8, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 503 By:  Campbell


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to financial assistance to local governmental entities
 affected by the realignment of defense jobs or facilities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 436.1531(a), Government Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (a)  The office may provide a loan of financial assistance to
 a defense community for an economic development project that
 minimizes the negative effects of a defense base reduction on the
 defense community as a result of a United States Department of
 Defense base realignment process that occurs during 1995 [2005] or
 later.  The loan shall be made from the Texas military value
 revolving loan account established under Section 436.156.
 SECTION 2.  Section 436.1532(a), Government Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (a)  The office may provide a loan of financial assistance to
 a defense community for an infrastructure project to accommodate
 new or expanded military missions assigned to a military base or
 defense facility located in, near, or adjacent to the defense
 community as a result of a United States Department of Defense base
 realignment process that occurs during 1995 [2005] or later.  The
 loan shall be made from the Texas military value revolving loan
 account established under Section 436.156.
 SECTION 3.  Sections 436.202(a) and (b), Government Code,
 are amended to read as follows:
 (a)  From money appropriated for this purpose, the
 commission may make a grant to an eligible local governmental
 entity to:
 (1)  enable the entity to match money or meet an
 investment requirement necessary to receive federal assistance
 provided to the local governmental entity for responding to or
 recovering from an event described by Section 436.201(b);
 (2)  match the entity's contribution for a purpose
 described by Section 436.203 at a closed or realigned defense
 facility; [or]
 (3)  construct infrastructure and other projects
 necessary to accommodate a new or expanded military mission at a
 military base or to reduce the impact of an action of the United
 States Department of Defense that will negatively impact a defense
 facility located in or near the entity; or
 (4)  construct infrastructure and other projects
 necessary to prevent the reduction or closing of a defense
 facility.
 (b)  The commission may not make a grant for an amount less
 than $50,000 or an amount more than the lesser of:
 (1)  50 percent of the amount of matching money or
 investment that the local governmental entity is required to
 provide, subject to Subsection (c);
 (2)  50 percent of the local governmental entity's
 investment for purposes described by Section 436.203 if federal
 assistance is unavailable; or
 (3)  $5 [$2] million.
 SECTION 4.  Section 436.203(c), Government Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (c)  An eligible local governmental entity described by
 Section 436.201(a)(3), [or] (4), or (5) may use the proceeds of the
 grant to purchase or lease equipment to train defense workers whose
 jobs have been threatened or lost because of an event described by
 Section 436.201(b) or to train workers to support military
 installations or defense facilities.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *