Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB526 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/15/2015

                    By: Birdwell S.B. No. 526
 (In the Senate - Filed February 10, 2015; February 18, 2015,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Business and Commerce;
 April 15, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 7,
 Nays 2; April 15, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to restrictions on holders of package store permits.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Sections 22.04 and 22.05, Alcoholic Beverage
 Code, are repealed.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *