Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB530 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Hancock S.B. No. 530
 (In the Senate - Filed February 10, 2015; February 18, 2015,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation;
 March 30, 2015, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; March 30, 2015,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 530 By:  Hancock


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the licensing of vehicles for hire by certain airport
 governing boards; authorizing the imposition of fees.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 22.081, Transportation Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 Sec. 22.081.  [TAXICAB] LICENSING OF VEHICLES FOR HIRE.
 (a)  A joint board may license taxicabs transporting passengers to
 or from the airport and impose fees for issuing the licenses.
 (b)  A joint board for which the constituent agencies are
 populous home-rule municipalities may license taxicabs and other
 vehicles for hire transporting passengers to or from the airport
 and impose fees for issuing the license.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *