Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB530 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/28/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 530


 AN ACT
 relating to the licensing of vehicles for hire and passenger
 transportation services by certain airport governing boards;
 authorizing the imposition of fees; expanding the authorization to
 require an occupational license; amending a provision subject to a
 criminal penalty.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 22.081, Transportation Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 Sec. 22.081.  [TAXICAB] LICENSING OF VEHICLES FOR HIRE AND
 PASSENGER TRANSPORTATION SERVICES.  (a)  A joint board may license
 taxicabs transporting passengers to or from the airport and impose
 fees for issuing the licenses.
 (b)  A joint board for which the constituent agencies are
 populous home-rule municipalities may:
 (1)  license vehicles for hire, including taxicabs, and
 passenger transportation services providing services to or from the
 airport for compensation; and
 (2)  impose fees for issuing the licenses.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 530 passed the Senate on
 April 9, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 28, 2015, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 530 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 24, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 132,
 Nays 9, three present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor