Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB540 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 03/31/2015

                    By: Eltife S.B. No. 540
 (In the Senate - Filed February 11, 2015; February 18, 2015,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Business and Commerce;
 March 31, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 7,
 Nays 0; March 31, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the hours during which a holder of a retail dealer's
 on-premise late hours license may sell beer.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 70.01, Alcoholic Beverage Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 70.01.  AUTHORIZED ACTIVITIES. The holder of a retail
 dealer's on-premise late hours license may sell beer for
 consumption on the premises on Sunday between the hours of 1:00 a.m.
 and 2 a.m. and on any other day between the hours of 12 p.m. and 2
 a.m. if the premises covered by the license are in an area where the
 sale of beer during those [the] hours is authorized under Section
 105.05(c) or (d) [by this code].
 SECTION 2.  The amendment by this Act of Section 70.01,
 Alcoholic Beverage Code, is intended to clarify rather than change
 existing law.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *