Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB57 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/28/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 57


 AN ACT
 relating to information collected by a regional tollway authority,
 regional mobility authority, regional transportation authority,
 metropolitan rapid transit authority, or coordinated county
 transportation authority.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 366.178(b-1), Transportation Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (b-1)  As an alternative to requiring payment of a toll at
 the time a vehicle is driven or towed through a toll assessment
 facility, the authority shall use video recordings, photography,
 electronic data, transponders, or other tolling methods to permit
 the registered owner of the nonpaying vehicle to pay the toll at a
 later date or provide toll exemptions. Information collected under
 this subsection, including contact, payment, and other account
 information and trip data, is confidential and not subject to
 disclosure under Chapter 552, Government Code.
 SECTION 2.  Sections 366.179(a) and (d), Transportation
 Code, are amended to read as follows:
 (a)  For purposes of this section, a transponder is a device
 placed on or within a motor vehicle [an automobile] that is capable
 of transmitting or receiving information used to assess or collect
 tolls or provide toll exemptions. A transponder is insufficiently
 funded if there is no money in the account for which the transponder
 was issued.
 (d)  Transponder [customer] account information, including
 contact and payment information and trip data, is confidential and
 not subject to disclosure under Chapter 552, Government Code.
 SECTION 3.  Section 370.177, Transportation Code, is amended
 by adding Subsection (m) to read as follows:
 (m)  Information collected for the purposes of this section,
 including contact, payment, and other account information and trip
 data, is confidential and not subject to disclosure under Chapter
 552, Government Code.
 SECTION 4.  Sections 370.178(a) and (d), Transportation
 Code, are amended to read as follows:
 (a)  For purposes of this section, "transponder" means a
 device placed on or within a motor vehicle [an automobile] that is
 capable of transmitting or receiving information used to assess or
 collect tolls or provide toll exemptions. A transponder is
 insufficiently funded if there is no money in the account for which
 the transponder was issued.
 (d)  Transponder [customer] account information, including
 contact and payment information and trip data, is confidential and
 not subject to disclosure under Chapter 552, Government Code.
 SECTION 5.  Section 372.102(a), Transportation Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  Notwithstanding the confidentiality of electronic toll
 collection customer account information, including confidentiality
 under Sections 228.057(e), 366.178(b-1), 366.179(d), 370.177(m),
 and 370.178(d), a toll project entity may publish a list of the
 names of the registered owners or lessees of nonpaying vehicles who
 at the time of publication are liable for the payment of past due
 and unpaid tolls or administrative fees.  The list may include only
 the persons' names and, for each person listed:
 (1)  the city and state of the person's residence;
 (2)  the total number of events of nonpayment; and
 (3)  the total amount due for the tolls and
 administrative fees.
 SECTION 6.  Section 451.061, Transportation Code, is amended
 by adding Subsection (f) to read as follows:
 (f)  Personal identifying information collected by an
 authority is confidential and not subject to disclosure under
 Chapter 552, Government Code, including a person's:
 (1)  name, address, e-mail address, and phone number;
 (2)  account number, password, payment transaction
 activity, toll or charge record, or credit, debit, or other payment
 card number; and
 (3)  other personal financial information.
 SECTION 7.  Section 452.061, Transportation Code, is amended
 by adding Subsection (e) to read as follows:
 (e)  Personal identifying information collected by an
 authority is confidential and not subject to disclosure under
 Chapter 552, Government Code, including a person's:
 (1)  name, address, e-mail address, and phone number;
 (2)  account number, password, payment transaction
 activity, toll or charge record, or credit, debit, or other payment
 card number; and
 (3)  other personal financial information.
 SECTION 8.  Section 460.109, Transportation Code, is amended
 by adding Subsection (e) to read as follows:
 (e)  Personal identifying information collected by an
 authority is confidential and not subject to disclosure under
 Chapter 552, Government Code, including a person's:
 (1)  name, address, e-mail address, and phone number;
 (2)  account number, password, payment transaction
 activity, toll or charge record, or credit, debit, or other payment
 card number; and
 (3)  other personal financial information.
 SECTION 9.  The changes in law made by this Act apply only to
 a request for information that is received by a regional tollway
 authority, regional mobility authority, regional transportation
 authority, metropolitan rapid transit authority, or coordinated
 county transportation authority on or after the effective date of
 this Act.  A request for information that was received before the
 effective date of this Act is governed by the law in effect on the
 date the request was received, and the former law is continued in
 effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 10.  This Act takes effect immediately if it
 receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each
 house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.
 If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate
 effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 57 passed the Senate on
 April 9, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendments on May 28, 2015, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 57 passed the House, with
 amendments, on May 23, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 140,
 Nays 0, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor